DARLEY, WILLIAM, second son of Charles Albert Darley, Burtonfield House, Yorks., landowner, and Marianne Mills, dau. of Rev. William Nesfield, Rector of Brancepeth, co. Durham; b. 25 Oct 1848; adm. (G) 26 Sep 1861; Min. Can. 1863; left Whitsun 1865; land agent (1881 Census); JP (1887) Yorkshire East Riding; m. 19 May 1875 Mary, dau. of William Parry-Jones.
DARLEY, EDMOND OSWALD, brother of Bertram Darley (qv); b. 19 Oct 1854; adm. (G) 24 Jan 1868; left Christmas 1871; a coffee planter in Ceylon for some years; subsequently living in Texas, U. S. A.; m.; d. in Mexico 1912.
Daniel, Walter Percy, son of the Rev. William Mayow Daniel, of Beckenham, Kent, by Mary Alice Sibyl, daughter of George Trollope, of Christ's Hospital; b. March 29, 1881; adm. as exhibitioner Sept. 27, 1895 (G); left April 1898; A. C. A. Nov. 4, 1903; with Price, Waterhouse, Peat and Co. at Calcutta for some years; m. Oct. 1, 1913, Edith, daughter of John George Todd, of St. John's Wood; d. April 18, 1948.
Dale, John Forfar, son of John Ainsworth Dale CB CBE, prin. Asst Sec. Min. of Labour, and Mary Forfar, d. of James Forfar Dott of West Blatchington, Sussex; b. 26 Jan. 1923; adm. Sept. 1935 (G); left Apr. 1939; Min. of Home Security 1939-42, RAC Middle East and Italy 1942, later with Specialised Armour Devel. Estab.; an agricultural engineer 1946-; m. 2 Sept. 1948 Jacqueline Genevieve, d. of Ren
DALE, JAMES ERNEST, eldest son of James Murray Dale, Aldeburgh, Suffolk, solicitor, and Anne Eliza, eldest dau. of James Norris, Debenham, Suffolk; nephew of Reginald Francis Dale, Assistant Master; b. 16 Feb 1855; adm. 28 Mar 1870 (G); left Election 1872; adm. Middle Temple 2 Nov 1874; m. Marion, dau. of Ven. George Dove, Archdeacon of Flinders, Adelaide, South Australia; d. at Walkeville, Adelaide 10 Jan 1892.
DALE, GODFREY, brother of James Ernest Dale (qv); b. 28 Jul 1861; adm. 5 Apr 1875 (G); QS (Capt. ) 1876; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1879, matr. 10 Oct 1879; BA 1885; MA 1897; ordained deacon 1886, priest 1887 (both Rochester); Curate, St. Peter’s, Rochester, Kent 1886-9; joined Universities Mission to Central Africa 1889; missionary in Zanzibar 1889-97; member, College of St. Saviour’s, Southwark 1897-9; Vicar of All Saints, Newmarket, Cambs. , 1899-1902; rejoined Universities Mission 1902; Canon of Zanzibar 1903 - , Chancellor 1908-18, Archdeacon 1917-22; Rector of Sternfield, Suffolk 1925-; author, The Contrast between Christianity and Mohammedanism, 1905, and of several translations from English into Swahili; m. 19 Sep 1899 Jane Hamilton, dau. of James Vincent Bell MD FRCS LRCP, Star Hill, Rochester.
D’OYLY, FRANCIS, eldest son of Rev. George D’Oyly DD, Rector of Lambeth, Surrey, and Maria Frances, dau. of William Bruere, Chetwynd, Shropshire; b. 27 Nov 1815; adm. (G) 8 Oct 1827; subsequently went to Eton; d. 27 Jul 1831.
CURTIS, EDWARD GEORGE, third son of Maj. -Gen. Reginald Curtis RA, St. George’s Square, London, and Marianne Emma, elder dau. of James Salmond, Waterfoot, Cumberland; b. 26 Nov 1868; adm. (R, subsequently G) 1 Jun 1880; left Aug 1881; at Cheltenham Coll. 1883-6; RMC Sandhurst 1887; 2nd Lieut., Bedfordshire Regt. 22 Aug 1888; Lieut., 6 Aug 1890; served Chitral Relief Force 1895; Capt., 30 Sep 1896; Maj., 2 May 1908; retd. 10 Feb 1909; Reserve of Officers; rejoined as Lieut. -Col., 4th battn., Northamptonshire Regt., 5 Aug 1914; served Gallipoli and Egypt; Col., Reserve of Officers 6 Aug 1918; demobilised 16 Oct 1919; despatches (LG) 13 Jul 1916, 28 Nov 1917, 11 Jun 1918, 5 Jun 1919; CMG 3 Jun 1916; Secretary, Royal Navy Club, Portsmouth; m. 10 Sep 1903 Ethel, younger dau. of Walter Coote; d. 6 Mar 1923.
CURTEIS, ROBERT MASCALL, second son of Herbert Mascall Curteis (qv); b. 12 Oct 1851; adm. (G) 26 Jan 1866; left Aug 1870; Merton Coll. Oxford, matr. 22 Jan 1872; played cricket for Sussex 1878; m. 14 Feb 1884 Florence Henrietta, eldest dau. of Rev. Robert Shuttleworth Sutton, Vicar of Rype, Sussex and Prebendary of Chichester; d. 21 Jan 1927.
CURTEIS, HERBERT, eldest son of Herbert Mascall Curteis (qv); b. 14 Apr 1849; adm. (G) 20 Jun 1863; left Aug 1868; Merton Coll. Oxford, matr. 25 Jan 1871; of Windmill Hill Place, Hailsham, Sussex; JP Sussex; an all-round sportsman; managed Sussex county cricket team for three years, and captained Gentlemen of Sussex; m. 12 Jan 1881 Isabella, youngest dau. of Sir Anchitel Ashburnham, Bart.; d. 28 Oct 1919.