AURIOL, EDWARD, brother of Charles James Auriol (qv); b. 27 Feb 1805; adm. (G) 12 Jan 1818; left 20 Mar 1822; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 4 Jun 1823; BA 1828; MA 1832; ordained; Rector of Newton Valence, Hants., 4 May 1838; Vicar of St. Dunstan in the West, Fleet Street, London, 7 Jan 1842-80; Prebendary of St. Paul’s from 17 Feb 1865; m. 28 Sep 1829 Georgiana Barbara, third dau. of Edward Morris (qv); d. 10 Aug 1880.
Goldsmiths. Established by Richard Blampied at St Helier Jersey in 1968.
AUSTEN, EDWARD; b.; adm. 10 Jun 1663; a boarder; left 1665 (Busby’s Account Book).
AUSTEN, GREAVES; b.; adm.; KS; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1657, subscribed 23 Oct 1657, Westminster Student; BA 16 Jan 1660/1; Master of Ottery St. Mary GS from 1662; under his mastership the school seems to have reached the height of its prosperity, “he having for many years together near 200 scholars under his care”; buried Ottery St. Mary, Devon 22 Jun 1699.
Austin, John, son of Edwin Austin, barrister-at-law, Town Clerk of Battersea, and Hilda Althea Austin; b. 13 Aug. 1908; adm. Sept. 1921 (H); left Dec. 1924; a building consultant; RE (India) in WW2 (Capt.); m. 29 Apr. 1939 Dorothy May, d. of Col. Walter Peaston Britton MBE, of Chnstchurch, Hants; d. 30 June 1973.
AUSTIN, RICHARD, fifth son of Rev. Wiltshire Stanton Austin, Rector of All Hallows, Lombard Street, London, and Dunkin, dau. of Francis Webster, Barbados, West Indies (IGI); b. 2 Dec 1833; adm. from King’s Coll. Sch. as BB 25 Sep 1847; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 18 Jan 1856.
AUTERAC, JOSEPH; b.; adm. 1 Jun 1774. [note will Joseph Auterac, Kensington, Middlesex, surgeon and apothecary, proved PCC 16 Aug 1836]
AVELING, CLAUDE LINDSAY CLIFFORD, second son of Stephen Thomas Aveling, Boveney, near Windsor, Berks. , mechanical engineer, and Mary Phebe, dau. of Rev. Richard Samuel Clifford, Vicar of Teynham, Kent; b. 26 Oct 1869; adm. from King’s School, Rochester (R) 31 May 1883; QS Jan 1884; elected to an exhibition at Christ Church, Oxford Jul 1888, matr. 12 Oct 1888; BA 1893; MA 1921; Assistant to Director, Royal Coll. of Music 1894; Assistant Registrar, Royal Coll. of Music, Registrar 1913-35; author, libretti and songs; m. 16 Apr 1903 Marguerite Mary Theodora, only dau. of Rev. William Henry Robins DD, Vicar of Gillingham, Kent, and Hon. Canon of Rochester; d. 28 Dec 1943.