ACCUM, FREDERICK ERNEST, son of Friedrich Christian Accum, chemist, food scientist and pioneer of gas lighting, and Mary Anne Simpson (IGI); b. 3 Apr 1801; adm. 20 Sep 1813; left Christmas 1813.
Acheson, Douglas Harold, son of John Fleetwood Acheson, schoolmaster; b. 16 March 1908; adm. Jan. 1922 (H); left Apr. 1925; Midshipman RN 1 Jan., Sub-Lieut. 1 May 1927; Lieut (E) 1 July 1931; Lieut.-Cdr (E) 1 July 1939, acting Cdr (E) 1 Aug. 1949; retd with rank of Cdr (E) 16 March 1951; AMIMechE 1946; m. 25 July 1936 Dora Valerie, d. of A.S. King of Herne Hill; d. 8 March 1987.
ACKLAND, CHARLES RICHARD; b.; at school in 1804; left 1806. [Presumably Charles Richard Dyke Acland, third son of Sir Thomas Dyke Acland, Bart., and Henrietta Ann, only dau. of Sir Richard Hoare, Bart. (qv), b. 4 Aug 1793; Lieut, Royal Navy 1 Jan 1814; Cdr., 29 Jan 1822; Capt., 30 Jan 1828; m. 8 Jul 1819 Charlotte Frances, widow of Capt. Richard Dalling Dunn, Royal Navy, and dau. of George [or James ?] Templer, Stover, Devon; d. at Cape of Good Hope 23 Apr 1828].
ACKLAND, CHARLES, eldest son of Charles Ackland, Leadenhall, London, and Harriet Grove Tabor (IGI); bapt. St. Peter, Cornhill 30 Oct 1797 (IGI); adm. Christmas 1812; BB 1812-5; Trinity Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 4 May 1815, aged 18, matr. 1815; adm. Middle Temple 29 Oct 1814. [note will Charles Ackland, proved PCC 28 Jan 1819]
ACKWORTH, ---; b.; in school list 1764; left Christmas 1764.
Publisher
ACTON, CHARLES JAMES, brother of John Acton (qv); b. 3 Aug 1863; adm. 27 Sep 1877 (J); left May 1880; Univ. Coll. Hospital; MRCS 1888; LRCP 1888; DPH 1891; a general medical practitioner at Wangford, Suffolk; still in Med. Dir. 1922 (not 1933).
ACTON, CHARLES JANUARIUS EDWARD, brother of Sir Ferdinand Richard Edward Dalberg-Acton, Bart. (qv); b. 6 Mar 1803; adm. 30 Sep 1813; left the same year on religious grounds, and went to a private tutor; Magdalene Coll. Cambridge, adm. fellow commoner 18 Jul 1819, matr. Lent 1820, residing to 1823; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 29 Jun 1822; entered Pontifica Accademia dei Nobili Ecclesiastici, Rome; Chamberlain to Pope Leo XII; attaché to Papal Nuncio in Paris 1828; Vice-Legate, Bologna to 1830; Secretary to Congregation for Regular Discipline; Auditor, Apostolic Chamber Jan 1837 - Jan 1842; Cardinal Priest from 24 Jan 1842, with titular church of Sta Maria della Pace; all English affairs of consequence were referred to Acton by Pope Gregory XVI and it was owing to his zeal that England was divided into eight instead of four Catholic districts in 1840; d. unm. at Naples 23 Jun 1847. DNB.
ACTON, JOHN, eldest son of James Acton, Southport, Lancs., and Ann, dau. of John Brown, Liverpool; b. 24 Sep 1860; adm. 4 Jun 1874; left Dec 1878; adm. solicitor Feb 1884; practised at Liverpool; d. unm. in South Africa 4 Nov 1896.