WILLIAMS, LEWIS VAUGHAN, son of Sir Edward Vaughan Williams (qv); b. 19 Jul 1836; adm. Nov 1849; QS 1851; left 1855; Ensign, Rifle Brigade 6 Jul 1855; Lieut., 19 Feb 1858; Adjutant, 1st battn., 9 Mar 1860; Capt., 16 Nov 1866; retd. Sep 1868; d. 3 Oct 1869.
Scholars
4151 People & Organisations results for Scholars
WILLIAMS, JOHN, eldest son of Rev. John Williams, Rhayader, Radnorshire, and Abigail, dau. of Evan Evans, Noyadd Cwmdanddwr, Radnorshire; b.; adm. Christmas 1811; KS (aged 13) 1812; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1816, matr. 25 May 1816, Westminster Student, Tutor and Censor 1829; BA 1820; MA 1822; Pro-Proctor 1831; ordained; Perpetual Curate of Tring, Herts., 1839-41; Vicar of Spelsbury, Oxfordshire 1841-56; m. 1840 Jane, widow of John Patterson; d. 30 Nov 1873.
WILLIAMS, JOHN, son of Rev. John Williams, Tiverton, Devon; b.; adm. (aged 8) Oct 1716; KS 1722; Capt. of the School 1726; elected head to Christ Church, Oxford 1727, matr. 8 Jun 1727, Westminster Student 22 Dec 1727 – void 5 Apr 1732; BA 1731; ordained deacon 24 Sep 1732, priest 18 Feb 1732/3 (both Rochester); Vicar of Oakham, Rutland, from 1 Oct 1736; d. 1782.
WILLIAMS, JOHN, of Denbighshire; b.; adm.; QS ; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1583, matr. 2 Jul 1585, aged 18, Westminster Student to c. 1597; BA 1587; MA 1590; BD 1597; DD 1602; ordained; Rector of Llanarmon yn Ial, Denbighshire 1596; Rector of Llangybi, Monmouthshire 1597; Vicar of Llanfair Dyffryn Clwyd, Denbighshire 1598; Vicar of Llanfwrog, Denbighshire 1603; Vicar of Bangor–is-y-Coed, Denbighshire 1606; Warden of Ruthin, Denbighshire, from 1606; d. 1621.
WILLIAMS, JAMES, son of Sir Thomas Williams, Bart., Chymical Physician to Charles II, and his second wife Grace Carwardine, dau. of Thomas Lewis, The Moor, Hereford; b.; adm.; KS 1685; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1688, adm. pens. 28 Jun 1688, aged 19, scholar 12 Apr 1689, matr. 1688; BA 1691/2; MA 1695; DD 1709; Minor Fellow, Trinity Coll. 2 Oct 1694, Major Fellow 8 Mar 1695 – c. 1712; ordained deacon 20 Mar 1697/8, priest 25 Sep 1698 (both Lincoln); Prebendary of St. Paul’s from 12 Dec 1707; Rector of St. Magnus, London Bridge, from 29 Jan 1710/1; Vicar of Chigwell, Essex, from 16 Oct 1721; d. Jul 1727.
WILLIAMS, HOLLAND, son of William Williams, Caernarvonshire, and his first wife Margaret, dau. of William Holland, Conway, Caernarvonshire; b. 21 Aug 1641; adm. ; KS 1658 (Chapter Muniments 43060); Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 19 Jul 1659; adm. Inner Temple Nov 1658, called to bar 1668; m. Jane, dau. of Edward Edwards, Llwyndu, Merionethshire; d. 1 Jan 1680.
WILLIAMS, HERVEY VAUGHAN, eldest son of Sir Edward Vaughan Williams (qv); b. 5 Apr 1829; adm. 12 Apr 1842; QS 1843; rowed v. Eton 29 Jul 1845, 30 Jul 1846, 29 Jul 1847; Capt. of the School 1847; elected head to Christ Church, Oxford 1848, matr. 28 Jun 1848; BA 1852; d. 4 Nov 1852.
WILLIAMS, GRIFFITH, son of Roger Williams, London, citizen and merchant, and Mary, dau. of Norton Curtiss, Morden, Surrey; bapt. 8 Jul 1675; adm.; KS 1691; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1693, adm. pens. 28 Jun 1693, aged 18, scholar 20 Apr 1694, matr. 1693; BA 1696/7; MA 1700; BD 1708; Minor Fellow, Trinity Coll. 2 Oct 1699, Major Fellow 5 Apr 1700 – c. 1715; ordained deacon (Lincoln) 12 Mar 1703/4, priest (Ely) 19 May 1706; signed petition to Bishop of Ely against Richard Bentley 1709; Rector of North Runcton, Norfolk, from 18 Apr 1712; m. Anne, only dau. of Rev. Robert Purland, Rector of East Walton, Norfolk; d. 8 Jan 1718.
Williams, Sir Griffith Goodland, son of Alfred Augustus Williams, of Llanfaethlu, Anglesey, by Elizabeth Florence, daughter of Mark Ovenden; b. Sept. 20, 1890; adm. as K.S. Sept. 22, 1904; elected head to Ch. Ch. Oxon. July 1909, matric. Michaelmas 1909; 1st class Classics (Mods.) 1911; B.A. 1913; M.A. 1925; 2nd Lieut. 4th Batt. Dorset Regt. (T.F.) April 9, 1915; served in India and Mesopotamia and was demob. as Capt.; asst. principal Board of Education 1919-25, principal 1925; under secretary, Ministry of Education, Jan. 1, 1946; deputy secretary, May 30, 1946-53; secretary of the Churches Main Committee 1954; C.B. 1945; K.B.E. 1949; d. 1974.
WILLIAMS, GEORGE JAMES, fourth son of William Peere Williams MP, Gray’s Inn, London, barrister, Chancery Reporter, and Anne, second dau. of Sir George Hutchins, Kt, Greville Street, Holborn, King’s Serjeant; b.; adm. (aged 9) Jun 1727; Min. Can. 1732; KS 1733; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1737, but went to Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 13 Jun 1737; adm. Inner Temple 13 Nov 1739; Inspector-Gen., Inland Excise Duties 1751 (still 1769, not 1780); Deputy Cofferer, Royal Household Nov 1761 – Jul 1765; Joint Receiver of Revenues, Virginia 1 Sep 1772 (still 1780); Receiver-Gen., Excise 8 Nov 1774-81; Paymaster to Forces, Nova Scotia (occurs 1780); FSA 15 Nov 1781; known as “Gilly” Williams; an intimate friend of George Selwyn, Richard Edgcumbe and Horace Walpole; m. 13 Jun 1751 Diana, illegitimate dau. of Hon. Peregrine Bertie, and step-daughter of William Coventry, 5th Earl of Coventry (Notes and Queries clxxiii, 206); d. 28 Nov 1805. DNB.