DUMMER, THOMAS, only son of Thomas Lee Dummer (qv); b.; adm. (aged 9) May 1749 (Hutton's); in school list 1754; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 8 Sep 1760; MP Newport (Isle of Wight) 26 Dec 1765-8, Yarmouth (Isle of Wight) 19 Jan 1769-74, Downton 1774 - 14 Feb 1775, Wendover 14 Mar 1775-80, Lymington from 1780; of Cranbury Park, Hampshire; FRS 27 May 1773; m. 5 Jun 1766 Harriott, dau. of Sir Cecil Bisshop, Bart., MP; d. 3 Jun 1781.
DUNCOMBE, HENRY, brother of Thomas Duncombe (qv); bapt. Helmsley, Yorks. 23 Jan 1728 (IGI); adm. (aged 8) Jan 1736/7 (Wynniate's); left 1745; Lincoln Coll. Oxford, matr. 28 Oct 1745; adm. Middle Temple 6 Apr 1747; probably “Henrique Documbe” recorded as visiting Capua, Italy, in Jan 1753; of Copgrove, Yorkshire; MP Yorkshire 1780-96; d. 10 Apr 1818.
DUNDAS, SIR DAVID, third son of James Dundas, Ochtertyre, Perthshire, Writer to the Signet, and Elizabeth, dau. of William Graham, Airth, Stirlingshire; b. 24 Jan 1799; adm. 29 Jan 1810; KS 1812; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1816, matr. 25 May 1816, Westminster Student; BA 1820; MA 1822; adm. Inner Temple, called to bar 7 Feb 1823, Bencher 1840, Treasurer 1853; QC Apr 1840; MP (Whig/Liberal) Sutherlandshire Apr 1840 - Jul 1852, Mar 1861 - May 1867; Solicitor-General 10 Jul 1846 - Mar 1848, resigning on grounds of health; knighted 4 Feb 1847; Judge Advocate-General 30 May 1849 - Feb 1852; Privy Councillor 29 Jun 1849; inherited Ochtertyre estate 1842; Trustee, British Museum 1861-7; Busby Trustee 5 May 1855-75; Chairman of committee chosen at meeting of OWW held in Jun 1860 to consider the question of the removal of the School into the country; presented a small collection of Greek and Roman coins to the School 1873; d. unm. 30 Mar 1877. DNB.
DUNN-GARDNER, JOHN, eldest surviving son of John Margetts, St. Ives, Hunts., brewer, and Sarah, wife of George Ferrers Townshend, 3rd Marquis Townshend, and dau. of William Dunn Gardner, Chatteris, Isle of Ely; b. 20 Jul 1811; adm. 16 Jun 1819 (Packharness'); left Nov 1828; assumed surname of Townshend in lieu of Margetts 1823, and known for some years as Lord John Townshend; subsequently assumed courtesy title of Earl of Leicester, but was declared by an Act of Parliament passed in 1843 to have no right to that title; assumed surname of Dunn-Gardner in lieu of Townshend 10 Aug 1843; MP (Cons) Bodmin 1841-7; DL Cambridgeshire, High Sheriff Cambridgeshire and Huntingdonshire 1859; JP Isle of Ely; a collector of early English and foreign silver (sold Christies Apr 1902 for £39, 020); m. 1st, 9 Dec 1847 Mary, sister of Richard Lawson (qv); m. 2nd, 15 Mar 1853 Ada, dau. of William Pigott, Dullingham House, Newmarket, Cambs.; d. 11 Jan 1903.
DYOTT, RICHARD, elder son of Gen. William Dyott, Freeford Hall, near Lichfield, Staffs., and Eleanor, dau. of Samuel Thompson, Green Mount, co. Antrim; b. 26 May 1808; adm. 16 Jun 1819 (Packharness'); left Jun 1826; Trinity Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 25 Jun 1824, matr. 1826; Ensign, 63rd Foot 11 Oct 1827; 70th Foot 17 Sep 1829; Lieut., half-pay, unattached, 14 Jun 1831; 53rd Foot, 21 Jun 1831; Capt., 31 Aug 1838, half-pay 1 Jul 1842; 36th Foot 25 Feb 1848, retired same day; DL Staffordshire, JP 1842, High Sheriff 1856; MP (Cons) Lichfield 1865-80; m. 6 Dec 1849 Ellen Catherine, only dau. of Charles Smith Forster MP, Lysways Hall, Staffs.; d. 13 Feb 1891.
Edwards, Roger Nicholas, Baron Crickhowell, brother of David William Wood Edwards (qv); b. 25 Feb. 1934; adm. Sept. 1947 (B); left July 1952; 2nd Lieut. 1st Batt. Welch Fusileers 1952-4; Trin. Coll. Camb., matric. 1954, BA 1957, MA 1968; Wm Brandts Sons & Co. Ltd., bankers, 1957-76, dir. 1972-6; member of Lloyd’s 1976, dir. A. L. Sturge 1970-6, PA Internat. & Sturge 1977-9; MP (Cons. ) Pembroke 1970-87; Sec. of State for Wales 1979-87; PC 1979; Hon. Fellow Univ. Coll. Cardiff 1985; created Baron Crickhowell 1987; pres. Univ. of Wales at Cardiff 1988-98; chmn. Nat. Rivers Authority 1989-96, Cameron May 1992-4, ITNET 1995-2004; dir. Welsh National Opera 1988-92; pres. Contemporary Art Soc. for Wales 1988-93; pres. SE Wales Arts Assn. and Contemporary Art Soc. for Wales; Hon. LLD Univ. of Glamorgan 2001; member House of Lords EU Sub-Committees 2000-10, Science and Tech. Committee 2007-10, Constitution Committee 2010-5; m. 26 Jan. 1963 Ankaret, d. of William James Healing, co. dir., of Tewkesbury, Gloucs.; d. 17 Mar. 2018.
ELLIS, JOHN, eldest son of Rev. John Ellis, Rector of Waddesdon, Bucks., and Susannah, dau. of William Welbore, Cambridge; b.; adm.; KS (aged 14) 1660; elected head to Christ Church, Oxford 1664, matr. 22 Jul 1664, Westminster Student 30 Dec 1664-81, Faculty Student from 1681; BA 1668; MA 1672 (both degrees in College Act Book, not in University records); employed in Secretary of State’s Office and State Paper Office; Secretary to Sir Leoline Jenkins at Conference of Nijmegen 1675-7; Secretary to Thomas Butler, Earl of Ossory 1678-80 and to James Butler, 1st Duke of Ormonde 1680-2; Secretary to Commissioners of Revenue, Ireland 1682-9; a Commissioner of Transports; Under Secretary of State May 1695 - May 1705; Comptroller of the Mint 23 May 1701-11; MP Harwich 1702-8; two volumes of his correspondence were edited by George James Welbore Agar-Ellis, 1st Baron Dover (qv); at the time of his death he had been a Student of Christ Church for over seventy-three years; d. unm. 8 Jul 1738. DNB.
ELLIS, WELBORE, 1ST BARON MENDIP, younger son of Welbore Ellis (qv); b. 15 Dec 1713; adm. Jul 1727; KS (Capt. ) 1728; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1732, matr. 15 Jun 1732, Westminster Student 29 Dec 1732 - resignation 25 Apr 1739; BA 1736; DCL 7 Jul 1773; inherited fortune of his uncle John Ellis (KS 1660, qv) in 1738; Grand Tour (Italy) 1739-40; MP Cricklade 24 Dec 1741-7, Weymouth 1747-61, Aylesbury 1761-8, Petersfield 1768-74, Weymouth 1774-90, Petersfield 29 Apr 1791- 13 Aug 1794; an active and useful member of the House of Commons; a Lord of the Admiralty 1747-55; Vice-Treasurer for Ireland 1755-62; Privy Councillor 20 Mar 1760; Secretary at War 1762-5; Vice-Treasurer of Ireland (again) 1765-6, 1770-7; Treasurer of the Navy 12 Jun 1777 – Apr 1782; Secretary of State for the American Colonies 11 Feb - Mar 1782; created Baron Mendip 13 Aug 1794, with special remainder to his great-nephew Henry Welbore Agar-Ellis, 2nd Viscount Clifden (qv); member, Society of Dilettanti 1740/1; FRS 20 Jun 1745; Trustee of the British Museum 1780; Busby Trustee 25 Mar 1777; was accustomed to boast of having slept both in the Old Dormitory and in the New Dormitory; m. 1st, 18 Nov 1747 Elizabeth, only dau. of Hon. Sir William Stanhope KB MP; m. 2nd, 20 Jul 1765 Anne, eldest dau. of George Stanley, Paultons, Hampshire; d. 2 Feb 1802. Buried in North Transept, Westminster Abbery. DNB.
Ensor, Alick Charles Davidson, son of Charles William Ensor MRCS LRCP, of Ealing, and Helen Margaret, d. of Rev. Alexander Glegg Creighton, Vicar of Holy Trinity Kilmarnock; b. 27 Nov. 1906; adm. Apr. 1920 (H); left July 1923; adm. a solicitor Dec. 1928; prosecuting solicitor Newcastle-on-Tyne 1932-5, Met. Police 1935-7; dep. Clerk of the Peace for Middx 1937-8; Clerk of the Peace for the County of London 1938-41; Army service 1939-44 (Capt.), despatches Dec. 1940; practised as solicitor in Brussels 1945-7; retd 1947 to farm in Dorset; MP (Lab.) Bury & Radcliffe 1964-70; subsequently a writer, lecturer and TV broadcaster; author of Thirty Acres and a Cow 1955, I was a Public Prosecutor 1958; appeared as presiding judge in TV series The Verdict is Yours; m. 1st 1932 Norah Russell; 2nd 1944 Frances Vivienne, d. of Francis William Mason MRCS LRCP of Bromsgrove, Worcs; d. 5 Feb. 1987 in France.
EVELYN, WILLIAM GLANVILLE, elder son of William Evelyn (afterwards Glanville) MP, Ightham, Kent, a Commissioner of the Revenue (I), and his second wife Bridget, dau. of Hugh Raymond, Saling Hall, Essex; b. 1734; adm. (aged 10) Feb 1743/4 (Morel's); left 1751; High Sheriff, Kent 1757; MP Hythe 1768-1802; m. 2 Aug 1760 Susannah, dau. of Thomas Ba[o ?]rrett, Shoreham, Kent; d. 3 Nov 1813.