REEKS, CHARLES FREDERICK, elder son of Charles Frederick Reeks FRIBA, Westbourne Square, London, architect, and Helen, third dau. of Charles Rowland, North Street, Westminster, Principal Clerk, House of Commons; b. 27 Jan 1857; adm. 29 Jan 1870 (James'); left May 1876; Trinity Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 7 Jun 1876; BA 1881; MA 1884; ordained deacon 1881, priest 1882 (both London); Curate, St. Mary Magdalen, Paddington 1881-97; Vicar of Monmouth, Monmouthshire 1897-1912; Rector of Hinton Waldrist, Berks., 1915-8; m. 29 Apr 1889 Maud Edith, fifth dau. of Lieut. -Gen. William Hill, Sutherland Avenue, Maida Vale, London; d. 28 Oct 1935.
REEKS, JAMES ALBERT, brother of Charles Frederick Reeks (qv); b. 9 Aug 1860; adm. 4 Jun 1874 (James'); left Apr 1877; RMC Sandhurst 1879; 2nd Lieut., 45th Foot 11 Aug 1880; Lieut., Derbyshire Regt., 4 May 1881; Capt., 19 May 1886; Adjutant, 5 Aug 1886; Maj., 1 Jan 1899; retd. 21 Sep 1904; re-employed in command depot of Sherwood Foresters in 1914-8 War; Hon. Lieut. -Col., 25 Dec 1917; OBE 1 Jan 1918; m. 24 Aug 1907 Elwena Grace, dau. of Sir Francis Norie Miller, Bart., MP, Cleeve, Perthshire; d. 7 Jan 1944.
REID, JOHN RAMSAY, only son of Hugh Galbraith Reid FSA, Assistant Comptroller, Stationery Office, and Christina, second dau. of James Ramsay McCulloch, Comptroller, Stationery Office, statistician and political economist; b. 18 Oct 1855; adm. 23 Sep 1869 (James'); left May 1874; Trinity Hall, Cambridge, matr. Mich. 1875; BA 1879; MA 1882; adm. Inner Temple 25 Jan 1878, called to bar 27 Apr 1883; d. 19 Oct 1893.
RICKARDS, WALTER GLENDINNING, son of Rev. Robert Francis Bute Rickards, Vicar of Constantine, Cornwall, and Rachel, youngest dau. of Joseph Heald, Wakefield, Yorks.; b. 2 Mar 1855; adm. 24 Jan 1868 (James'); left May 1870; “cashier at brewery “ (1881 Census, then living at Streatham, Surrey); subsequently in business in Philippines; m.; d. at Manila, Philippines 29 Apr 1908.
ROBINSON, SIR HARRY PERRY, third son of Rev. Julian Robinson, Chaplain EICS, editor Pioneer newspaper [check], and Harriet Woodcock, dau. of Rev. John Sharpe DD, Vicar of Doncaster, Yorks.; b. 30 Nov 1859; adm. 12 Jun 1873 (James'), exhibitioner; QS (Capt. ) 1874; Capt. of the School 1877; elected head to Christ Church, Oxford 1878, matr. 11 Oct 1878; lived in USA 1883-1900; owner and editor, The Railway Age 1887-1900; Chief of Department, McKinley’s National Campaign Committee 1896; Managing Director, Isbister & Co., 1901-4; Special Correspondent of The Times newspaper in many parts of the world; War Correspondent, The Times 1914-8; Chevalier, Légion d’Honneur 1919; KBE 1 Jan 1920; author, Of Distinguished Animals, 1911, and other works; m. 1st, 21 Sep 1891 Mary, dau. of Thomas Lowry, Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA; m. 2nd, 1 Aug 1905 Florence Anne, dau. of Joseph Tester, Surbiton, Surrey; d. 20 Dec 1930.
ROBSON, EDWARD FROGATT, eldest son of Edward Robson, Richmond, Surrey, solicitor, and Georgiana, dau. of George Waller, Wood Hall, Suffolk; b. 14 Jul 1857; adm. 31 Mar 1869 (James'); left Easter 1871; at Harrow Sch. Apr 1872 – Dec 1873; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 17 Apr 1880; member, London Stock Exchange; d. unm. 21 Dec 1909.
ROBSON, HENRY NAUNTON, brother of Edward Frogatt Robson (qv); b. 12 Oct 1861; adm. 16 Apr 1873 (James'); left Dec 1880; St. Thomas’s Hospital 1888; MRCS LRCP 1902; d. unm. 21 Jul 1925.
ROBSON, WILLIAM WALLER CONSTABLE, brother of Edward Frogatt Robson (qv); b. 26 Feb 1860; adm. 12 Apr 1871 (James'); left Apr 1873; at Eton Coll. 1873-6; St. Thomas’s Hospital; MRCS LRCP 1883; medical practitioner at Chiswick, Middlesex; m. 4 Aug 1886 Rebecca, dau. of Richard Ballard, Patcham, Sussex; d. 3 Jun 1934.
RODOCANACHI, MICHEL MICHEL, brother of Emmanuel Michel Rodocanachi (qv); b. 8 Nov 1856; adm. 21 Jan 1870 (James'); left May 1875; general merchant (1881 Census); m. 26 Jan 1884 Despina, eldest dau. of George Emmanuel Scaramanga, Worth, Sussex, general merchant; d. 16 Dec 1911.
ROGERS, BERTRAM MITFORD HERON, brother of Henry Reynolds Knatchbull Rogers (qv); b. 25 Aug 1860; adm. 12 Jun 1873 (James'); left Aug 1877; Non-Coll. Oxford, matr. 17 Jan 1880; migrated to Exeter Coll.; BA 1883; MB BCh 1889; MD 1892; played Association Football for Oxford 1880, 1881; Univ. Coll. Hospital; LRCP MRCS 1889; Consulting Physician, Bristol Royal Hospital for Sick Children; practised at Bristol; served in 1914-8 War; Maj., RAMC 16 May 1914; m. 1 Oct 1891 Agnes Constance, eldest dau. of Rev. Carteret John Halford Fletcher, Rector of Carfax, Oxford; d. 10 Feb 1953.