WILSON, SAMUEL, son of Samuel Wilson, Shrewsbury, Shropshire; b.; adm.; BB 1666; KS 1668; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1670, matr. 1 Jul 1670, aged 19, Westminster Student 20 Dec 1670 – void 1678; BA 1674; MA 1677; ordained; Vicar of Oswestry, Shropshire 1690-2; according to the autobiography of William Taswell (adm. 1660, qv), Wilson owed his election to Oxford to “the recommendation of the Earl of Montgomery his godfather”.
Wilson, Robert Andrew, son of Robert Bruce Wilson of Billericay, Essex, and Margaret, d. of Abraham Phillips of Clifton, Bristol; b. 18 Julv 1905; adm. Sept. 1919 (KS); left July 1924; Trin. Coll. Camb., matric. 1924, BA 1927 (1st dass hons Classical Trip. Pts I and 2), MA 1946; asst Keeper Dept. of Printed Books British Museum 1929, dep. Keeper 1948, Keeper 1952, principal Keeper 1959-66; CB Jan. 1962; m. 1967 Rosemary Ann, d. of Sydney Joseph Norris of Gravesend, Kent; d. 18 Aug. 1984.
WILSON, PHILIP, fourth son of Thomas Wilson, Tobago, West Indies; b.; adm. Christmas 1809; KS (aged 13) 1810; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1814, adm. pens. 21 May 1814; migr. to Trinity Coll. Oxford, matr. 26 Apr 1816; BA 1820; MA 1823; adm. Middle Temple 28 Jan 1815; ordained; Rector of Ilchester, Somerset 1830-7; d. 23 Jun 1847, aged 52.
WILSON, JOHN, son of John Wilson (elected to Oxford 1602, qv); b. ; KS 1640 (J. E. B. Mayor and R. F. Scott, Admissions to St. John’s Coll. Camb. , i, 61); St. John’s Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 30 Sep 1641, aged 16, matr. 1645; BA 1645/6; MA 1649; adm. Inner Temple Nov 1646, called to bar 1654; fought in the Civil War for the King; d. 24 Sep 1681.
WILSON, JOHN, of Middlesex; b.; adm.; QS; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1602, matr. 5 Nov 1602, aged 16, Westminster Student to 1612; BA 1606; MA 1609; DD 1619; adm. Gray’s Inn 2 Feb 1612/3; a joint patent of the Head Mastership of the School was granted to Richard Ireland (qv) and himself 25 Jan 1609/10; on Ireland’s escape to France a few months later he became Head Master; a joint patent of the Head Mastership was granted to him and to Lambert Osbaldeston (qv) 7 Dec 1621, Osbaldeston succeeding him as Head Master in 1622; ordained; Rector of Bedale, Yorks., from 8 Aug 1621; Vicar of Burneston, Yorks., 1 Jul 1622-34; Rector of St. Mary, Castlegate, York 1625; Prebendary of Westminster Oct 1623 – res 1635, of Ripon 14 Aug 1623 and of Lincoln from 3 Mar 1629/30; Dean of Ripon from 1624; Master of the Savoy; lic. to m. 22 Apr 1616 Johanna, dau. of William Stanlake, King Street, Westminster, grocer; d. 19 Feb 1634/5.
WILSON, JAMES ARTHUR, son of James Wilson, Great Queen Street, Lincoln’s Inn Fields, London, surgeon and teacher of anatomy, and ---, dau. of John Clarke, Wellingborough, Northants, surgeon; b. 1795; in school list 1801; KS 1808; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1812, matr. 9 May 1812, Westminster Student 1812-7, Faculty Student 1817-24; 1st cl. Classics and 1st cl. Mathematics 1815; BA 1815; MA 1818; MB 1819; MD 1823; Radcliffe Travelling Fellow 1821; practised medicine initially in Paris, but returned to England in 1829; FRCP 28 Mar 1825, Censor 1828, 1851, Harveian Orator 1850; Physician to St. George’s Hospital 1829-57, Consulting Physician from 1857; author, On Spasm, Languor, Palsy, and other Disorders termed Nervous, of the Muscular System, 1843; m. 1st, 29 Apr 1824 Jessie Janet Shedden, dau. of James Scrimgeour; m. 2nd, 22 Jun 1871 Eleanor, second dau. of Hon. and Rev. Littleton Powys, Rector of Titchmarsh, Northants; d. 29 Dec 1882. DNB.
Wilson, George Balfour, son of Col. John George Yule Wilson, C.B.E., of Ealing, by Helena Theresa, daughter of George Duncan Gibb, M.D., of London; b. Sept. 12, 1887; adm. as Q.S. Sept. 27, 1900; Capt. of the School 1904; elected head to Trin. Coll. Camb. (with Samwaies) July 1906, matric. Michaelmas 1906; 1st class Classical Tripos (div. 2), pt. 1, 1909; B.A. 1909; appointed to the I.C.S. 1910; arrived in India Nov. 29, 1911; Asst. Commissioner, Punjab; retired March 1922; 2nd Lieut. Indian Army Reserve of Officers July 2, 1918; sec. E. P. Henderson, Ltd., since 1923; m. Nov. 1, 1913; Lucy Gertrude, daughter of Sir Michael William Fenton, K.C.S.I., of Harrow, Middlesex.
WILSON, BERNARD, son of Bernard Wilson, Newark, Notts., hosier, and Anne Tenison; b. 1689; adm.; QS 1704; elected head to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1709, adm. pens. 23 Jun 1709, scholar 22 Apr 1710, matr. 1709; BA 1712/3; MA 1719; DD 1737; ordained deacon (London) 16 Mar 1711/2, priest (Lincoln) 26 Feb 1715/6; Rector of Firsby, Lincs., 1715-9; Vicar of Great Steeping, Lincs., 1715-9; Vicar of Newark, Notts., from 17 Apr 1719; Rector of Winthorpe, Notts., 18 Nov 1719 (disp. to hold with Newark); Prebendary of Lincoln from 13 May 1727, Lichfield from 11 Jun 1730, and of Worcester from 13 Oct 1735; adm. Middle Temple 14 Mar 1736/7 [check]; Master of St. Leonard’s Hospital, Newark; amassed a large forune and became a miser in his later years; left a large legacy to Mrs. Thrale; translated the first twenty-six books of De Thou’s Historia sui Temporis, 1729-30; m. 27 Dec 1748 Elizabeth Bradford, Claypole, near Nottingham; d. 30 Apr 1772. DNB.
WILSON, ANTHONY, only son of Richard Wilson, Louth, Ireland, and his second wife Elizabeth, eldest dau. of Anthony Walsh, Ardagh, co. Armagh, Ireland; nephew of Very Rev. William Pratt, Dean of Cloyne; b. 10 May 1748; adm.; KS 1761; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1765, matr. 7 Jun 1765, aged 18, Westminster Student from 24 Dec 1765; BA 1769; adm. Middle Temple 6 Apr 1768; d. unm. at Dublin, Ireland 1771.
WILMOT, WILLIAM, son of William Wilmot (or Willmott), Abingdon, Berks., and Elizabeth --- (IGI); bapt. St. Nicholas, Abingdon, Berks. 28 Oct 1649 (IGI); adm.; KS 1664; elected to Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 13 Jul 1666, aged 17, Westminster Student 17 Jan 1667 – void 1670.