AUSTEN, GREAVES; b.; adm.; KS; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1657, subscribed 23 Oct 1657, Westminster Student; BA 16 Jan 1660/1; Master of Ottery St. Mary GS from 1662; under his mastership the school seems to have reached the height of its prosperity, “he having for many years together near 200 scholars under his care”; buried Ottery St. Mary, Devon 22 Jun 1699.
AYLESBURY, SIR THOMAS, BART., second son of William Aylesbury, St. Andrew’s, Holborn, London, and his first wife Anne, dau. of John Poole, Sapperton, Gloucs.; b.; adm.; QS in 1596; elected head to Ch. Ch. Oxford 1598, matr. 24 Nov 1598, aged 18, Westminster Student to 1612; BA 1602; MA 1605; MA Camb. (lit. reg. ) 1635/6; Secretary to Earl of Nottingham and Duke of Buckingham as successive Lord High Admirals; created baronet 19 Apr 1627; one of the Masters of Requests 1625 – c. 1641 (paid to 25 Mar 1641); Master of the Mint Aug 1635-42, holding post jointly with Sir Ralph Freeman until their suspension by Parliament as Royalist supporters; retired to the Low Countries after the death of Charles I; a learned mathematician, and a great “encourager of learning and learned men”; lic. to m. 3 Oct 1611 Anne, widow of William Darell, and eldest dau. of Rev. Francis Denman, Rector of West Retford, Notts.; d. at Breda, Netherlands 1657. DNB.
AYLOFFE, JOSEPH, son of Sir William Ayloffe, Bart., MP, and his third wife Alice, dau. of James Stokes, Stoke, near Coventry, Warwicks.; b.; adm.; KS 1636; elected head to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1640, adm. pens. 18 May 1640, scholar 1641, matr. 1640; BA 1643/4; MA 1647; adm. Gray’s Inn 31 Oct 1646, called to bar 1653, ancient 18 May 1667; Savoy Manor Steward, Duchy of Lancaster 8 Aug 1660 - successor appointed Apr 1673; of Brittayns, Hornchurch, Essex; m. Frances, dau. of Henry Ayscough, Yorkshire; d. at Montpellier, France. (will proved PCC 29 Jul 1674, as of Gray’s Inn).
AYLOFFE, WILLIAM, son of Thomas Ayloffe, Bassingbourn, Cambs.; b.; adm.; KS 1674; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1680, adm. pens. 19 Jun 1680, aged 18, scholar 22 Apr 1681, matr. [check]; 3rd in ordo 1683/4; MA 1687; LLD 1705; Minor Fellow, Trinity 19 Apr 1687, Major Fellow from 22 Jul 1687, Tutor 1693-8, Senior Fellow 1714, Senior Bursar 1716-9, 1722-6; supported John Colbatch (qv) in his prolonged struggle against Bentley; Public Orator, Univ. Cambridge, 1696-1727; d. 1728.
AYLWORTH, RICHARD, eldest son of Richard Aylworth, Aylworth, Naunton, Gloucs., and Mary, dau. of Sir Thomas Sackville, Kt, Bibury, Gloucs.; b.; adm.; KS 1671; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1673, adm. pens. 28 Jun 1673, scholar 1674; adm. Middle Temple 23 Jun 1675; buried 3 Apr 1677, aged 23.
BABER, HARRY, son of Rev. Henry Hervey Baber FRS, Rector of Stretham, Cambs., and Keeper of Printed Books, British Museum, and Ann, dau. of Harry Smith; b. 18 Mar 1817; adm. 3 Jul 1828 (Stelfox's); KS 1830; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1834, adm. pens. 13 Jun 1834, scholar 1835, matr. Mich. 1834; BA 1839; MA 1842; ordained deacon 26 Jul 1840, priest 11 Aug 1841 (both Norwich); Diocesan Inspector of Schools, Staffordshire 1844-7; Chaplain, Whitelands Training Institution, Chelsea 1847-72; Vicar of Ramsbury, with Axford, Wilts., from 1872; m. 10 Aug 1847 Sarah Frances, eldest dau. of Joshua Rodwell, Alderton, Suffolk; d. 18 Jan 1892.
BABER, SIR JOHN, son of John Baber MP, Recorder of Wells, Somerset, and Elizabeth, dau. of William Walrond, Isle Brewers, Somerset; b. 18 Apr 1625; adm.; KS 1640; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1642, matr. 21 Oct 1642, aged 17, Westminster Student; BA and MB 1646; MD Angers 1648 (incorp. Oxford 18 Jul 1650); ejected from his studentship at Christ Church by the Parliamentary Visitors for refusing to appear before them 1648; practised medicine in King Street, Covent Garden; FRCP 17 Aug 1657; Physician to Charles II Jun 1660 - Oct 1675; knighted 19 Mar 1660/1; satirized by John Donne (qv) in the Humble Petition of Covent Garden against Dr John Baber, 1661; a Gentleman of the Privy Chamber to Charles II, appointed 1679, and to James II, appointed 1685; one of the original trustees of the will of Richard Busby (qv); m. 1st, (by 1653) Elizabeth, dau. of Sir John Richards, Kt., Yaverland, Isle of Wight; m. 2nd, lic. to m. 1 Aug 1674, Anne, Viscountess Bayning, widow of Henry Murray, Groom of the Chamber to Charles I, and dau. of Paul, 1st Viscount Bayning; m. 3rd, 15 Feb 1680/1 Bridget, widow of Charles Needham, 4th Viscount Kilmorey (I), and of Sir John Shaw, Bart., and dau. of Sir William Drury, Besthorpe, Norfolk; buried St. Paul’s, Covent Garden, London 3 Apr 1704. DNB.
BABER, THOMAS FRANCIS, son of Thomas Hervey Baber, EICS Bombay, Principal Collector and Political Agent, South Mahratta, India, and Helen Somerville, widow of Capt. Donald Cameron EICS [check Presidency], and sister of Capt. James Peter Fearon, EI Maritime Service; b. 12 May 1802; adm. 28 Jun 1815 (Smedley's); KS 1816; left Bartholomewtide 1818; Christ’s Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 24 Nov 1819, matr. Nov 1820; Cadet, EICS Madras 1821; Ensign, unattached 27 Apr 1822; Lieut., 44th Native Infantry 23 Feb 1825; d. at sea on passage to England 21 Jan 1827.
BABINGTON, MATTHEW, third son of Matthew Babington MP, Rothley Temple, Leics., and Anne, youngest dau. of Sampson Hopkyns, Stoke, Warwicks.; b.; adm.; KS 1663; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1665, adm. pens. 29 Jun 1665, scholar 1666; BA 1668/9; MA 1672; Fellow of Trinity from 1671, Tutor 1673-7; University Lecturer in Mathematics 1676; d. 1680, aged 36.
BABINGTON, ZACHARY, son of Zachary Babington, Curborough, Staffs., and Catherine, dau. of John Alden, London; b.; adm.; KS (aged 14) 1660; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1662, matr. 19 Jul 1662, aged 18, Westminster Student 22 Dec 1662-70 (void); BA 1666; MA 1669; ordained; Vicar of Trelleck, Monmouthshire, from 18 Jan 1670; d. unm. June or July 1691.