PHILIPPS, SIR JOHN, BART. , eldest son of Sir Erasmus Philipps, Bart. , MP, and Catherine, dau. of Hon. Edward Darcy; b. ; adm. ; KS 1679 (as John Philips); elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1682, scholar 9 May 1683, matr. 1682; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 1684; MP Pembroke 1695-1702, Haverfordwest 4 Mar 1718-22; succ. father as 4th baronet 18 Jan 1697; prominent member of Society for the Propagation of the Gospel, and of Society for Promotion of Christian Knowledge, and an early patron of Methodism; m. 12 Dec 1697 Mary, dau. of Anthony Smith, East India merchant; d. 5 Jan 1737, aged 70.
STEELE, THOMAS, son of Thomas Steele, Chichester, Sussex, Recorder of Chichester, and Elizabeth Madgwick, Cuckfield, Sussex; bapt. 17 Nov 1753; in school list 1764; KS (Capt. ) 1766; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1771, adm. pens. 29 May 1771, scholar 15 May 1772, matr. 1772; adm. Middle Temple 18 Jan 1772; MP Chichester 1780-1807; Secretary to Master-Gen. of Ordnance 1782; Joint Secretary to Treasury 27 Dec 1783-91; Joint Paymaster-Gen. of the Forces 7 Mar 1791 – Jul 1804; Privy Councillor 9 Mar 1791; Commissioner, Board of Control 16 May 1791 – Jun 1793; Receiver-Gen. , Alienation Office 1793-7; King’s Remembrancer, Court of Exchequer from 7 Nov 1797; the discovery in 1807 that he had not accounted for two large sums of money withdrawn by him from the Pay Office brought about his withdrawal from public life; m. 3 Sep 1785 Charlotte Amelia, sister of William Lindsay (qv); d. 8 Dec 1823.
VINCENT, HENRY; b. ; adm. ; KS 1700. [Possibly Sir Henry Vincent, Bart. , fourth but eldest surviving son of Sir Francis Vincent, Bart. MP, Stoke D’Abernon, Surrey, and Rebecca, dau. of Jonathan Ashe, London, merchant; bapt. Stoke D’Abernon, Surrey 10 Jul 1685 (IGI); Corpus Christi Coll. Oxford, matr. 11 Oct 1703, aged 18; MP Guildford 21 Feb 1728-34; succ. father as 6th baronet 10 Feb 1736; m. Elizabeth, dau. of Bazaliel Sherman, London, Turkey merchant; d. 20 Jan 1757 : see William Vincent, below]
ABBOT, CHARLES, 1ST BARON COLCHESTER, younger brother of John Farr Abbot (qv); b. 14 Oct 1757; adm. Mar 1763; KS (Capt) 1770; both “acted and looked Thais extremely well in the Eunuchus” of 1772 (Random Recollections of George Colman the Younger, 1830, i, 74); Captain of the School 1774; elected head to Christ Church, Oxford 1775, matr. 14 June 1775, Westminster Student 22 Dec 1775 - 20 Oct 1783, Faculty Student 20 Oct 1783 - res 17 Dec 1796; Chancellor’s Prize for Latin Verse 1777; Vinerian Scholar 1781, Fellow 1786-92; BCL 1783; DCL 1793; Geneva Univ. 1778-9; adm. Middle Temple 14 Oct 1768, called to bar 9 May 1783, Bencher 12 Feb 1802; in brother’s chambers at 11 Kings Bench Walk, Temple, Nov 1779; adm. Inner Temple 25 Nov 1784 and 29 Apr 1785, tenant of chambers there Nov 1784 - May 1788; adm Lincoln’s Inn 26 May 1785; FSA 13 Dec 1792; FRS 14 Feb 1793; Clerk of the Rules, Court of King’s Bench 1794-1801; MP Helston 19 Jun 1795-1802, Woodstock 1802-6, Oxford University 1806-Jun 1817; made his parliamentary reputation as chairman, Select Committee on Finance 1797-8; introduced first Census Act into House of Commons Dec 1800; Chief Secretary for Ireland Feb 1801-Feb 1802, also Secretary of State for Ireland Jun 1801 - Feb 1802; Privy Councillor 21 May 1801; Recorder of Oxford May 1801-Oct 1806; Keeper of Privy Seal (I) from May 1801; hon. LLD Trinity Coll. Dublin 6 Jun 1801; elected Speaker of the House of Commons 10 Feb 1802; resigned on account of ill-health 28 May 1817; cr. Baron Colchester 3 Jun 1817; travelled on European Continent 1819-22; on return took active part in politics until death; a Busby Trustee from 18 May 1802; his Diary and Correspondence were published by his son Charles Abbot, 2nd Baron Colchester (qv), in 1861; m. 29 Dec 1796 Elizabeth, eldest dau. of Sir Philip Gibbes, Bart., Spring Head, Barbados, West Indies; d. 8 May 1829; buried in North Transept, Westminster Abbey. Arms up School. DNB.
CARLETON, DUDLEY, 1ST VISCOUNT DORCHESTER, son of Anthony Carleton, Brightwell Baldwin, Oxfordshire, and his second wife Jocosa, dau. of John Goodwin, Winchington, Bucks.; b. 10 Mar 1573/4; adm.; QS ; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1591, matr. 11 Feb 1591/2, Westminster Student to 1607; BA 1595; MA 1600 (incorp. Camb. 1626); DCL 31 Aug 1636; Secretary to Sir Thomas Parry, Ambassador to Paris, 1602; MP St. Mawes Mar 1603/4 - Feb 1610/1, Hastings Jan 1625/6 - May 1626; ? adm. Grays Inn 21 Feb 1604/5; Secretary to Henry Percy, Earl of Northumberland; suspected of complicity in the Gunpowder Plot, but succeeded in clearing himself while under arrest; Ambassador to Venice 1610-5, The Hague 1616-25; knighted Sep1610; Vice-Chamberlain of the Household 1625-6; Privy Councillor 1626; Envoy to Paris 1626, The Hague 1626-8; created Baron Carleton 22 May 1626 and Viscount Dorchester 25 Jul 1628; Secretary of State from 18 Dec 1628; the most sagacious and successful British diplomat of his day; m. 1st, Nov 1607 Anne, dau. of George Gerrard, Dorney, Bucks., and step-dau. of Sir Henry Savile (founder of Savilian Professorship at Oxford); m. 2nd, 1630 Anne, widow of Paul Bayning, 1st Viscount Bayning, and dau. of Sir Henry Glemham, Little Glemham, Suffolk; d. 15 Feb 1631/2. Buried Westminster Abbey, monument in St. Paul’s Chapel. DNB.
ELLIS, WELBORE, 1ST BARON MENDIP, younger son of Welbore Ellis (qv); b. 15 Dec 1713; adm. Jul 1727; KS (Capt. ) 1728; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1732, matr. 15 Jun 1732, Westminster Student 29 Dec 1732 - resignation 25 Apr 1739; BA 1736; DCL 7 Jul 1773; inherited fortune of his uncle John Ellis (KS 1660, qv) in 1738; Grand Tour (Italy) 1739-40; MP Cricklade 24 Dec 1741-7, Weymouth 1747-61, Aylesbury 1761-8, Petersfield 1768-74, Weymouth 1774-90, Petersfield 29 Apr 1791- 13 Aug 1794; an active and useful member of the House of Commons; a Lord of the Admiralty 1747-55; Vice-Treasurer for Ireland 1755-62; Privy Councillor 20 Mar 1760; Secretary at War 1762-5; Vice-Treasurer of Ireland (again) 1765-6, 1770-7; Treasurer of the Navy 12 Jun 1777 – Apr 1782; Secretary of State for the American Colonies 11 Feb - Mar 1782; created Baron Mendip 13 Aug 1794, with special remainder to his great-nephew Henry Welbore Agar-Ellis, 2nd Viscount Clifden (qv); member, Society of Dilettanti 1740/1; FRS 20 Jun 1745; Trustee of the British Museum 1780; Busby Trustee 25 Mar 1777; was accustomed to boast of having slept both in the Old Dormitory and in the New Dormitory; m. 1st, 18 Nov 1747 Elizabeth, only dau. of Hon. Sir William Stanhope KB MP; m. 2nd, 20 Jul 1765 Anne, eldest dau. of George Stanley, Paultons, Hampshire; d. 2 Feb 1802. Buried in North Transept, Westminster Abbery. DNB.
NEWDIGATE, SIR ROGER, BART., brother of Sir Edward Newdigate, Bart. (qv); b. 30 May 1719; adm. Oct 1727; KS (Capt. ) 1732; succ. brother as 5th baronet 4 Apr 1734; left Jan 1736; University Coll. Oxford, matr. 9 Apr 1736; MA 1738; DCL 13 Apr 1749; Grand Tour (France, Italy) 1738-40; of Harefield Place, Middlesex, and Arbury, Warwickshire; MP Middlesex 5 Aug 1742-7, Oxford University 31 Jan 1751-80; again travelling in Europe 1774-6; a staunch Tory, described in 1767 by Horace Walpole as a “half-converted Jacobite”; interested in architecture and classical sculpture; a benefactor of University Coll. and of the Radcliffe Library; founded Newdigate Prize for English verse at Oxford Univ. 1806; m. 1st, 31 May 1743 Sophia, dau. of Edward Conyers MP, Copped Hall, Epping, Essex; m. 2nd, 3 Jun 1776 Hester Margaretta, dau. of Edward Mundy, Shipley, Derbs.; d. 20 Nov 1806. DNB.
TRELAWNY, EDWARD, fourth son of Sir Jonathan Trelawny, Bart. (qv); bapt. 9 Jul 1699; adm.; QS (Capt. ) 1713; elected head to Christ Church, Oxford 1717, matr. 27 Jun 1717, Westminster Student 20 Dec 1717 - vacated 11 Jul 1721, when re-entered as gentleman commoner; adm. Inner Temple 2 Jun 1715; MP West Looe 20 Jan 1724 - Dec 1732; a Commissioner for Victualling 21 Oct 1725 – 9 Mar 1732/3; a Commissioner of Customs, Scotland 1732-7; elected MP for both West and East Looe at general election 1734, but disqualified for sitting for either, as being a Commissioner of Customs; Governor of Jamaica 30 Apr 1738 - Sep 1752; an able and efficient administrator; settled the Maroons; Col., 49th Foot, from 25 Dec 1743; took part in expedition against Cartagena 1742 and in capture of Port Louis, San Domingo 1748; returned to England 1753; m. 1st, 6 Nov 1737 Amoretta, dau. of John Crawford (and “niece to Countess of Dartmouth” (GM)); m. 2nd, 2 Feb 1752 Catherine, widow of Robert Penny, Attorney-Gen., Jamaica, and dau. of John Douce, Clarendon, Jamaica; d. 16 Jan 1754. DNB. [Perhaps Lieut., 6th Dragoons 1724-6].
PHILLIMORE, JOHN GEORGE, eldest son of Joseph Phillimore (KS 1789, qv); b. 5 Jan 1808; adm. 22 Oct 1817 (G); KS 1820; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1824, matr. 28 May 1824, Westminster Student 1824-36, Faculty Student 1836-; BA 1828; MA 1831; Junior Clerk, Board of Control 1827-32; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 5 Feb 1828, called to bar 23 Nov 1832, Bencher Mich. 1851; QC 8 Jul 1851; Reader in Constitutional Law and legal History to Inns of Court 1852; MP (Whig/Liberal) Leominster 1852-7; author, An Introduction to the Study and History of the Roman Law, 1848, and other works; m. 1 Aug 1839 Rosalind Margaret, younger dau. of Right Hon. Sir James Lewis Knight-Bruce PC, Lord Justice of Appeal; d. 27 Apr 1865. DNB.
DOLBEN, SIR WILLIAM, BART., only surviving son of Sir John Dolben, Bart. (qv); b. 26 Jan 1726/7; adm. (aged 7) Sep 1734; KS 1740; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1744, matr. 28 May 1744, Westminster Student 24 Dec 1744 - void by marriage 27 Jun 1748; DCL 7 Jul 1763; succ. father as 3rd baronet 20 Nov 1756; High Sheriff, Northants. 1760; Verderer of Rockingham Forest 1765; MP Oxford University 3 Feb 1768-68, Northamptonshire 1768-74, Oxford University 1780-1806; a respected member of the House of Commons and a steady supporter of Wilberforce’s measures for the abolition of the slave trade; m. 1st, 17 May 1748 Judith, dau. of Somerset English, Housekeeper of Hampton Court Palace; m. 2nd, 14 Oct 1789 Charlotte, widow of John Scotchmer, Troston Hall, Suffolk, banker, and sister of John Affleck (qv); d. 20 Mar 1814. DNB.