BLACKWELL, SIR LAMBERT, BART., only son of Sir Charles Blackwell, Bart., and Anne, dau. of Sir William Clayton, Bart., MP; b.; succ. as 3rd baronet 18 Jul 1741; adm. (aged 11) Apr 1744 (Morel's); left 1750; Queen’s Coll. Oxford, matr. 26 Apr 1750; m. at Rotterdam, Netherlands, 19 Oct 1760 (IGI) Amelia, widow of Michael Pope, Whitsun Court, Bristol, and dau. of Col. --- Martin; d. 9 May 1801.
BLACKSTONE, HENRY; b.; adm.; KS; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1615, adm. scholar 1616.
BLACKSTONE (or BLAXTON), JOSHUA, brother of Henry Blackstone (at school 1582, qv); b.; adm.; QS ; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1599, adm. scholar 1600; BA 1603/4; MA 1607; BD 1614; Fellow of Trinity Coll. 1607 - c. 1614; ordained; Vicar of St. Peter’s, Wisbech, Cambs., from 1612; d. 1615 (will proved PCC 9 Sep 1615, surname given as Blaxton).
BLACKSTONE (or BLAXTON), HENRY, eldest son of Rev. Henry Blackstone DD, Chancellor of Chichester, and Joan, sister of Sir George Buck, Master of the Revels; b.; at school 2 Jul 1582; QS; elected head to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1585, adm. scholar 1586; BA 1589/90; MA 1593; ML 1597; Fellow of Trinity Coll. 1591 - res 1597; two Latin letters written by him to William Camden are printed in Camdeni Epistolae, 1691, 44-5, 344-5.
BLACKETT, FRANCIS ST. JOHN, son of Henry Blackett, Ealing, Middlesex; b. 24 Jun 1864; adm. (G) 23 Sep 1875; left Aug 1878.
BLACKETT, ARTHUR STEWART, youngest son of Rev. Henry Ralph Blackett, Perpetual Curate of Hanover Chapel, Regent Street, London, and Adelaide, youngest dau. of Richard Mills, The Grove, Camberwell, Surrey; b. 15 Jan 1865; adm. (G) 25 Mar 1876; left Dec 1881; member, London Stock Exchange; m. 19 Apr 1894 Caroline Frances, elder dau. of Maj. Charles Walsham Maynard, Royal Artillery, Elsieshields Tower, Dumfriesshire; d. 5 Dec 1922.
BLACKBURNE, LANCELOT, son of Richard Blackburne, London; b. 10 Dec 1658; adm.; KS 1671; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1676, matr. 20 Oct 1676, Westminster Student 24 Dec 1676-85 (void); BA 1680; MA (in his absence) 28 Jan 1683/4; ordained 1681; went to Antigua, West Indies, soon after his ordination; a protegé of Sir Jonathan Trelawny, Bart. (q. v. ), Bishop of Exeter; Prebendary of Exeter 15 Jun 1691, Sub-Dean 1695-1702, 1704-5; Rector of Calstock, Cornwall, 29 May 1696 (dispensation to hold with Bishopric of Exeter 1716/7); Vicar of Altarnun, Cornwall, 1699 (dispensation to hold with Calstock, 1699); Dean of Exeter 3 Nov 1705 - Feb 1716/7; Archdeacon of Cornwall 24 Jan 1714/5 - Feb 1716/7 (but dispensation to hold with Bishopric of Exeter, 1716/7 ?); Chaplain in Ordinary to George I (Chamberlayne 1716); DD Lambeth 28 Jan 1716; consecrated Bishop of Exeter 24 Feb 1716/7; Lord Almoner from 26 Oct 1723; Archbishop of York from 8 Nov 1724; Privy Councillor 10 Dec 1724; Busby Trustee from 18 Feb 1725/6; a gay and witty divine of remarkably free manners, which gave rise to many scandalous stories; was described by Horace Walpole as “the jolly old Archbishop of York who had all the manners of a man of quality, though he had been a buccaneer, and was a clergyman; but he retained nothing of his first profession, except his seraglio” (Walpole, Memoirs of the Reign of George II, 1847, i, 87); m. 2 Sep 1684 Catherine, widow of Walter Littleton, Lichfield, Staffs., and dau. of William Talbot, Stourton Castle, Staffs.; d. 23 Mar 1742/3. DNB.
Blackburn, Maurice Cecil Mitford, son of Maj. Maurice Edgar Musgrave Blackburn, Indian Army, and Gladys Marion, d. of Robert Osbaldeston Mitford, of Mitford Castle, Northumberland; b. 17 July 1923; adm. Sept. 1936 (H); left July 1941; KCL 1946-8, BSc 1948; flying boat captain, Aquila Airways and Eagle Aviation 1948-59, Reseau Aerien Interinsulaire, Tahiti, 1959-60; Internat. Computers Ltd. 1960-88; m. 1st, 4 Apr. 1957 Yvonne Eileen Hinns; 2nd, 13 June 1975 Sarah, d. of Col. Matthew Dunning DSO MB RAMC; d. 12 Jan. 2015.
BLACKALL, THOMAS, brother of John Offspring Blackall (qv); b. 18 May 1814; adm. 14 Jan 1829 (Stelfox's); left Dec 1831; Gonville and Caius Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 23 Jun 1832, scholar 1833-5, matr. Mich. 1832; BA 1837; MA 1840; ML 1843; MD 1848; FRCP 1848; practised in London (but living in Exeter, non-practising, by 1881); d. 4 May 1899.
BLACKALL, JOHN OFFSPRING, son of John Blackall MD FRCP, Southernhay, Exeter, Devon, and Laura, youngest [eldest ?] dau. of Ralph Barnes (adm. 1744, qv); b. 4 Nov 1809; adm. 9 Oct 1822 (Stelfox's); KS 1823; drowned in the River Exe 9 Aug 1826.