ABBOT, CHARLES, 1ST BARON COLCHESTER, younger brother of John Farr Abbot (qv); b. 14 Oct 1757; adm. Mar 1763; KS (Capt) 1770; both “acted and looked Thais extremely well in the Eunuchus” of 1772 (Random Recollections of George Colman the Younger, 1830, i, 74); Captain of the School 1774; elected head to Christ Church, Oxford 1775, matr. 14 June 1775, Westminster Student 22 Dec 1775 - 20 Oct 1783, Faculty Student 20 Oct 1783 - res 17 Dec 1796; Chancellor’s Prize for Latin Verse 1777; Vinerian Scholar 1781, Fellow 1786-92; BCL 1783; DCL 1793; Geneva Univ. 1778-9; adm. Middle Temple 14 Oct 1768, called to bar 9 May 1783, Bencher 12 Feb 1802; in brother’s chambers at 11 Kings Bench Walk, Temple, Nov 1779; adm. Inner Temple 25 Nov 1784 and 29 Apr 1785, tenant of chambers there Nov 1784 - May 1788; adm Lincoln’s Inn 26 May 1785; FSA 13 Dec 1792; FRS 14 Feb 1793; Clerk of the Rules, Court of King’s Bench 1794-1801; MP Helston 19 Jun 1795-1802, Woodstock 1802-6, Oxford University 1806-Jun 1817; made his parliamentary reputation as chairman, Select Committee on Finance 1797-8; introduced first Census Act into House of Commons Dec 1800; Chief Secretary for Ireland Feb 1801-Feb 1802, also Secretary of State for Ireland Jun 1801 - Feb 1802; Privy Councillor 21 May 1801; Recorder of Oxford May 1801-Oct 1806; Keeper of Privy Seal (I) from May 1801; hon. LLD Trinity Coll. Dublin 6 Jun 1801; elected Speaker of the House of Commons 10 Feb 1802; resigned on account of ill-health 28 May 1817; cr. Baron Colchester 3 Jun 1817; travelled on European Continent 1819-22; on return took active part in politics until death; a Busby Trustee from 18 May 1802; his Diary and Correspondence were published by his son Charles Abbot, 2nd Baron Colchester (qv), in 1861; m. 29 Dec 1796 Elizabeth, eldest dau. of Sir Philip Gibbes, Bart., Spring Head, Barbados, West Indies; d. 8 May 1829; buried in North Transept, Westminster Abbey. Arms up School. DNB.
Fitzherbert, Sir William, Bart., son of William Fitzherbert, M.P., of Tissington, co. Derby, a Commissioner of Trade and Plantations, by Mary, eldest daughter of Littleton Poynta Meynell, of Bradley, in the same co.; b. May 27, 1748; in school lists 1764; left Christmas 1764; St. John's Coll. Camb. (adm. fellow commoner Feb. 19, 1765); M.A. 1770; adm. to Lincoln's Inn June 14, 1773, called to the bar June 24, 1776; Recorder of Derby; a Gent. Usher to George III; created a baronet Jan. 22, 1784; author of A Dialogue on the Revenue Laws, and of a collection of moral Maxims; m. 14 Oct. 1777, Sarah, only daughter of William Perrin, of Jamaica; d. 30 July 1791 (see DNB)
LEWIS, MATTHEW GREGORY, elder son of Matthew Lewis (qv); b. 9 Jul 1775; adm. 19 Jul 1783; a successful actor in the Town Boys’ plays; played Falconbridge in King John and My Lord Duke in High Life below Stairs to great applause (Letters and Correspondence, i, 42); Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 27 Apr 1790, Canoneer Student 23 Dec 1790 – void 25 Jun 1803; BA 1794; MA 1797; attaché to British Embassy, The Hague May – Dec 1794; author, Ambrosio, or the Monk, 1795, a best-selling novel which made him famous as “Monk” Lewis; MP Hindon 1796-1802; his play, The Castle Spectre, ran for sixty nights from 14 Dec 1797 under Sheridan’s management at Drury Lane; author, Tales of Wonder, 1801, also poems and other plays; visited West Indies estates to make arrangements for welfare of his slaves 1815-6, 1817-8; d. unm. at sea on his voyage home from Jamaica 14 May 1818. DNB.
ROSE, GEORGE, second son of Rev. David Rose, Lethnot, Forfarshire, nonjuring clergyman, and his second wife Margaret, dau. of Donald Rose, Westerclunie [check county]; b. 17 Jun 1744; at school under Markham (Diaries and Correspondence of the Right Hon. George Rose, 1860, i, 8-9); entered Royal Navy; served as midshipman in expedition to St. Malo 1758 and in West Indies, twice wounded in action; left navy 1762; Clerk in Record Office of Exchequer; Deputy Chamberlain, Exchequer 20 May 1774 – Feb 1783; Surveyor of Green Wax Moneys 21 Jul 1775; superintended the printing of the Journals and Rolls of the House of Lords; Secretary to the Treasury Jul 1782 – Apr 1783, Dec 1783 – Mar 1801; Clerk of the Pleas, Court of Exchequer Jan 1784 – Feb 1797; MP Launceston 1784 – Jun 1788, Lymington 1 Jul 1788-90, Christchurch from 1790; Clerk of the Parliaments, House of Lords, from Jun 1788; Privy Councillor 13 Jan 1802; Vice-Pres., Board of Trade, and Joint Paymaster-Gen., 7 Jul 1804 – Feb 1806; Vice-Pres., Board of Trade, and Treasurer of the Navy 15 Apr 1807-12; Treasurer of the Navy from 1812; Trustee, British Museum, from 1804; an intimate friend and political follower of William Pitt; of considerable financial ability; author, The Proposed System of Trade with Ireland Explained, 1785, and other publications chiefly on financial subjects; his Diaries and Correspondence were published in 1860; m. 7 Jul 1769 Theodora, dau. of Maj. John Duer, Antigua, West Indies, and Fulham, Middlesex; d. 13 Jan 1818. DNB.
BYNG, JOHN, 5TH VISCOUNT TORRINGTON, brother of George Byng, 4th Viscount Torrington (qv); b. 11 Oct 1742; at school under Markham (list of noblemen educated at the School preserved in Chapter Muniments); Page of Honour to King George II 25 Jan 1753 - Mar 1760; Cornet, Royal Horse Guards, 11 Jan 1760; Capt., 58th Foot, 29 Feb 1762; Lieut. and Capt., 1st Foot Guards, 11 Aug 1762; Capt. -Lieut., 19 Feb 1776; Capt. and Lieut. -Col., 26 Apr 1776; retd. 18 May 1780; a Commissioner of Stamps, 1 Jun 1782-99; succeeded his brother as 5th Viscount Torrington 14 Dec 1812; his travel diaries for the years 1781-94 have been published as The Torrington Diaries, 4 vols.; m. 16 Mar 1767 Bridget, dau. of Commodore Arthur Forrest, Royal Navy, sometime Commander in Chief, Jamaica station; d. 1 Jan 1813. DNB Missing Persons.
IRVING, JAMES; eldest son of James Irving II, and Mary, dau. of Philip O'Connor, Carrickfoyle, Jamaica; b. 9 Jan 1792; adm.; Exeter Coll. Oxford; m. 19 May 1819 Judith Bowen, dau. of Dr Thomas Nasmyth, Rhodes Hall, Jamaica; d. 10 Feb 1857.
MILLS, PETER MATTHEW, only son of Matthew Mills, St. Kitts, West Indies, and Cornelia, elder dau. of Col. Peter Soulegre, St. Kitts; b. 23 Mar 1743; at school under Markham (J. Peile, Biog. Reg. of Christ’s Coll. , ii, 271); Christ’s Coll. Cambridge, adm. fellow commoner 23 Oct 1760, resided to Dec 1761; of St. Kitts, West Indies; m. 1762 Catherine, dau. of Dr. William Hamilton; d. 15 Dec 1791.
PINNOCK, JAMES, son of Thomas Pinnock (adm. 1724, qv); b. 27 Sep 1740; adm. Oct 1750 (Howe's); left 26 Oct 1758; Trinity Hall, Cambridge, adm. 28 Oct 1758, matr. Mich. 1758, but did not graduate; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 27 Mar 1758, called to bar 13 May 1765; Advocate-Gen. , Jamaica Dec 1787; his diary and account book are preserved in the British Library (Add. MSS 33316, 33317), and the latter contains a few references to his attendance at the Anniversary Meetings and at the Play; travelling in Italy with family 1791-2, 1793-4; m. 19 Apr 1772 Elizabeth, sister of George Dehany (qv); d. 6 Apr 1811.
POLLARD, ROBERT BLEMELL, son of Robert Blemell Pollard, Master of St. Margaret’s Hospital, Westminster, and Charity ---; b. 10 Mar 1783; at school 1793; in school list 1795; BB 1795-1801; St. John’s Coll. Cambridge, adm. Bishop Williams scholar 20 May 1801; BA 1805; Master of Green Coat School, Tothill Fields, Westminster; subsequently Master of Blemell House School, Knightsbridge (on site later occupied by Brompton Oratory); m. 31 Jul 1806 Frances Crispe, Snodland, Kent; d. 10 Jan 1864.
AIKENHEAD, JOHN LAWRENCE, only son of William Aikenhead, St. Thomas in the Vale, Jamaica; b.; adm. (aged 10) Jun 1745; left 1752; Trinity Coll. Oxford, matr. 14 May 1752, aged 17; BCL 1759; DCL 8 Jul 1773; adm. Middle Temple 8 May 1752, called to bar 24 Nov 1758; d. 1780 (will proved PCC 30 Mar 1780, as of Grosvenor Place]