Identity area
Type of entity
Authorized form of name
Parallel form(s) of name
Standardized form(s) of name according to other rules
Other form(s) of name
Identifiers for corporate bodies
Description area
Dates of existence
History
BOURNE, VINCENT, son of Andrew Bourne, St. Martins in the Fields, Westminster, wig maker, and Ann --- (IGI); bapt. St. Martin’s in the Fields 22 Jul 1694 (IGI); adm.; Min. Can. (aged 14) 1709; QS 1710; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1714, adm. pens. 27 May 1714, scholar 13 May 1715, matr. 1715; BA 1717/8; MA 1721; Minor Fellow, Trinity Coll., 6 Sep 1720, Major Fellow 5 Jul 1721; an Usher at the School 1720 - Sep 1747; kept a boarding house in Cowley Street 1731-40 and in College Street 1741 to death 2 Dec 1747, where he was succeeded by Mrs.Porten. First of thirty-one recorded boarders adm. Jan.1735/6, last recorded boarder adm. Oct 1745. Five further boarders, adm. between Jun 1749 and Jan 1751/2, are described in Dr.Nicoll’s admission book as boarding with “Bourne”, and it may be that these were boarders with Bourne’s widow Lucia, presumably at a different address from that in College Street; Housekeeper and Deputy Serjeant-at-Arms, House of Commons, Nov 1734; an indolent teacher and a lax disciplinarian; William Cowper (qv), who loved “the memory of Vinny Bourne” and translated a number of his old master’s Latin poems into English verse, relates seeing the Duke of Richmond “set fire to his greasy locks and box his ears to put it out again” (Southey, Life and Works of William Cowper, iv, 98); a Latin poet of great charm, “sucking from every flower, making a flower of everything, his diction all Latin and his thoughts all English” (Works of Charles and Mary Lamb, 1905, vi, 457); published his Poemata, Latine partim reddita partim scripta, 1734; m. 25 Mar 1727 Lucia, widow of George Jewell (qv); d. 2 Dec 1747. DNB.
Places
Legal status
Functions, occupations and activities
Mandates/sources of authority
Internal structures/genealogy
General context
Relationships area
Access points area
Subject access points
Place access points
Occupations
Control area
Authority record identifier
Institution identifier
Rules and/or conventions used
International Standard Archival Authority Record for Corporate Bodies, Persons and Families - ISAAR(CPF) 2nd edition
Status
Level of detail
Dates of creation, revision and deletion
Prepared for import into AtoM by Westminster School Archive staff, 2019-2020
Language(s)
Script(s)
Sources
Users should note that the information recorded here that is not to be found in the first two volumes of the Record of Old Westminsters and its first Supplement has been assembled from various published and manuscript sources by Hugh Edmund Pagan MA FSA, and all new resulting text is his copyright, © 2014.
The Record of Old Westminsters: A biographical list of all those who are known to have been educated at Westminster School from the earliest times to 1927, Volumes 1 & 2, compiled by G. F. Russell Barker and Alan H. Stenning, London, 1928.