JENNINGS, JOHN; b.; adm. (aged 9) Jan 1740/1 (Bourne's); left 1749.
Bourne's
36 People & Organisations results for Bourne's
INGRAM, CHARLES, 9th VISCOUNT IRVINE (S), seventh son of Hon. Charles Ingram MP, Adjutant-Gen. of the Forces, and Elizabeth, widow of Francis Brace, Biddenham, Bucks., and dau. of Charles Scarburgh, Windsor, Berks., Clerk of the Board of Green Cloth; b. 19 Mar 1726/7; adm. Jan. 1736/7 (Bourne's); left 1743; MP Horsham 1747 – 14 Apr 1763; Groom of the Bedchamber to George III as Prince of Wales 1756-60; succeeded uncle as 9th Viscount Irvine (S) 14 Apr 1763; a Scottish Representative Peer from 1768; lic. to m. 28 Jun 1758 Frances Gibson, commonly called Shepheard, Scotland Yard, Whitehall, natural dau. of Samuel Shepheard MP, Exning, Suffolk; d. 19 Jun 1778.
HOLT, JOHN; b.; adm. (aged 11) Jun 1749 (Bourne's); left 1750.
HERVEY, FREDERICK AUGUSTUS, 4th EARL OF BRISTOL, third son of John Hervey, 2nd Baron Hervey of Ickworth (qv); b. 1 Aug 1730; adm. Jan 1741/2 (Bourne's); left 1747; Corpus Christi Coll. Cambridge, adm. 10 Nov 1747; MA 1754; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 24 Feb 1747/8; a Clerk of the Privy Seal 1753, Principal Clerk 1761-7; ordained deacon 24 Aug 1754, priest 26 Jan 1755 (both Ely); Chaplain in Ordinary to George III 1763-8 [check]; travelled in Italy 1765-6; Chaplain to his elder brother when Lord Lieut. Ireland in 1766-7; consecrated Bishop of Cloyne 31 May 1767; Privy Councillor (I) 9 Oct 1767; Bencher, King’s Inns, Dublin 1767; DD Trinity Coll. Dublin 16 Feb 1768; translated to Derry 18 Feb 1768; DD Oxford (from Brasenose Coll. ) 6 Apr 1770; again in Italy 1770-2 and 1777-9; succeeded his brother as 4th Earl of Bristol 23 Dec 1779; FRS 28 Feb 1782; advocated relaxation of penal laws against Roman Catholics and the abolition of tithes; Chaplain-General to Irish Volunteers 1782, attending Volunteer convention in Dublin Nov 1783 as delegate from Co. Londonderry; again in Italy 1785-6 and 1789-90; left Britain for last time in Sep 1792, and spent rest of his life in European travel, principally in Italy; imprisoned by French in Milan 1798-9; succ. relative as 5th Baron Howard de Walden 18 Nov 1799; of liberal opinions and eccentric personal conduct, and a capricious patron of architects and artists; m. 10 Aug 1752 Elizabeth, sister of Sir Robert Davers, Bart. (qv); d. on his way between Albano and Rome 8 Jul 1803. DNB.
HASTINGS, HON. GEORGE, brother of Francis Hastings, 10th Earl of Huntingdon (qv); b. 29 Mar 1730; adm. Jun 1740 (Bourne's); d. 20 Dec 1743. Buried North Transept, Westminster Abbey.
HASTINGS, FRANCIS, 10TH EARL OF HUNTINGDON, eldest son of Theophilus Hastings, 9th Earl of Huntingdon, and Lady Selina Shirley, second dau. of Washington Shirley, 2nd Earl Ferrers; b. 13 Mar 1728/9; adm. Apr 1737 (Bourne's); styled Lord Hastings to 1746; succ. father as 10th Earl of Huntingdon 13 Oct 1746; Head Town Boy 1746; left 1747; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 22 Jun 1747; Grand Tour (France, Spain, Italy) c. 1750-6, again travelling in Italy 1771-4; Master of the Horse to George III when Prince of Wales 1756-60; Master of the Horse 18 Nov 1760 – 3 Apr 1761; Privy Councillor 2 Dec 1760; Groom of the Stole and First Lord of the Bedchamber 3 Apr 1761 – 10 Jan 1770; bearer of Third Sword of State at coronation of George III 22 Sep 1761; DL Yorkshire West Riding 1757, Lord Lieut. 25 Feb 1763 – 12 Sep 1765; FRS 2 Mar 1758; FSA 10 Nov 1768; one of the leaders of fashionable society; Busby Trustee 17 Apr 1780; d. unm. 2 Oct 1789.
GIBBON, WALTER, son of Francis Gibbon, Cranbrook, Kent, and Elizabeth, dau. of Samuel Stileman, Otford, Kent; b.; adm. (aged 13) Sep 1749 (Bourne's); Min. Can. 1750; KS 1751; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1755, adm. pens. 28 May 1755, scholar 14 May 1756, matr. 1756.
FELL, ROBERT; b.; adm. (aged 10) Jan 1738/9 (Bourne's); left 1742.
EDWARDS, HUGH, son of Rice Edwards, Brecon, and Ann, dau. of Meredith James, Town Clerk of Brecon; b. 26 Mar 1723; adm. (aged 16) Jun 1740 (Bourne's); left 1741; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 14 May 1741; adm. Lincoln’s Inn 19 Jun 1740; d. 1749.
DILKES, THOMAS, son of Michael Dilkes, Dublin, Ireland, and Westminster; b.; adm. (aged 12) Jun 1749 (Bourne's); in school list 1754; adm. Inner Temple 29 May 1755; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 21 May 1756. [Perhaps son of Gen. Michael O’Brien Dilkes; and perhaps Capt. in Army 14 Jun 1765; 49th Foot 30 Sep 1768; Maj., 20 Feb 1773; father of next ? (and brother of last ?)][father Michael O’Brien Dilkes MP (I), hon. LLD Trinity Coll. Dublin ?]