Identity area
Type of entity
Authorized form of name
Parallel form(s) of name
Standardized form(s) of name according to other rules
Other form(s) of name
Identifiers for corporate bodies
Description area
Dates of existence
History
BOYLE, HENRY, 1ST EARL OF SHANNON (I), second son of Lieut. -Col. Hon. Henry Boyle, and Lady Mary O’Brien, d. of Murrough O’Brien, 1st Earl of Inchiquin (I); b.; adm.; QS 1702; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 5 Mar 1704/5, aged 18; of Castle Martyr, co. Cork; MP (I) Midleton 1707-13, Kilmallock 1713-4, co. Cork 1715-56; successfully resisted the attempt of the government in 1729 to obtain a vote for a continuation of supplies to the Crown for twenty-one years; Privy Councillor (I) 13 Apr 1733; Chancellor of the Exchequer (I) 19 Nov 1733 - Nov 1735, 1739-54, 1755-6; opposed the government proposal for appropriating the Irish surplus, 1753; Speaker of the Irish House of Commons 4 Oct 1733 - 31 Mar 1756; LLD Trinity Coll. Dublin 1735; the parliamentary leader of the Whig party in Ireland; styled by Walpole “the King of the Irish Commons”; acted no less than fifteen times as a Lord Justice in the absence of the Lord Lieutenant; on resigning the Speakership he was granted a government pension and created Earl of Shannon (I) 7 Apr 1756; m. 1st, 1715, Catherine, dau. of Chidley Coote, Kilmallock, co. Limerick; m. 2nd, Sep 1726 Lady Henrietta Boyle, dau. of Charles Boyle, 3rd Earl of Cork (I) and 2nd Earl of Burlington; d. at Dublin 28 Dec 1764. DNB.
Places
Legal status
Functions, occupations and activities
Mandates/sources of authority
Internal structures/genealogy
General context
Relationships area
Access points area
Subject access points
Place access points
Occupations
Control area
Authority record identifier
Institution identifier
Rules and/or conventions used
International Standard Archival Authority Record for Corporate Bodies, Persons and Families - ISAAR(CPF) 2nd edition
Status
Level of detail
Dates of creation, revision and deletion
Prepared for import into AtoM by Westminster School Archive staff, 2019-2020
Language(s)
Script(s)
Sources
Users should note that the information recorded here that is not to be found in the first two volumes of the Record of Old Westminsters and its first Supplement has been assembled from various published and manuscript sources by Hugh Edmund Pagan MA FSA, and all new resulting text is his copyright, © 2014.
The Record of Old Westminsters: A biographical list of all those who are known to have been educated at Westminster School from the earliest times to 1927, Volumes 1 & 2, compiled by G. F. Russell Barker and Alan H. Stenning, London, 1928.