Identity area
Type of entity
Authorized form of name
Parallel form(s) of name
Standardized form(s) of name according to other rules
Other form(s) of name
Identifiers for corporate bodies
Description area
Dates of existence
History
DERING, SIR EDWARD, BART., son of Sir Anthony Dering Kt, Deputy Lieutenant of Tower of London, and his second wife Frances, dau. of Sir Robert Bell Kt, Lord Chief Baron of the Exchequer; b. 28 Jan 1598; at school under Ireland and/or Wilson (M. E. Bond, ed., The Diaries and Papers of Sir Edward Dering Second Baronet 1644 to 1684, London, 1976, p. 109, where Dering records that his father died “of an imposthume in his head, taking beginning as it was verily thought, from a box on the eare given him many yeares before at Westminster Schoole”); Magdalene Coll. Cambridge; knighted 22 Jan 1619; Lieutenant of Dover Castle; created baronet 1 Feb 1626/7; MP Hythe 1625, Kent 1640-2; active promoter of church reform in 1640-1, serving as chairman of House of Commons committee on religion and moving first reading of Root and Branch Bill 27 May 1641, but subsequently defending the retention of bishops; a published collection of his speeches was ordered to be burnt by the House of Commons 4 Feb 1641/2 and he was briefly imprisoned in the Tower; joined royalist party on outbreak of the Civil War and raised a cavalry regiment for the King; resigned commission 1643; one of first to accept terms of composition from Parliament 1644; his interest in history and religion is evidenced by a number of publications; m. 1st, 29 Nov 1619 Elizabeth, dau. of Sir Nicholas Tufton (afterwards 1st Earl of Thanet); m. 2nd, Anne, third dau. of Sir John Ashburnham, Kt, Ashburnham, Sussex; m. 3rd, 16 Jul 1629 Unton, dau. of Sir Ralph Gibbes, Kt, Honington, Warwicks.; d. 22 Jun 1644. DNB.
Places
Legal status
Functions, occupations and activities
Mandates/sources of authority
Internal structures/genealogy
General context
Relationships area
Access points area
Subject access points
Place access points
Occupations
Control area
Authority record identifier
Institution identifier
Rules and/or conventions used
International Standard Archival Authority Record for Corporate Bodies, Persons and Families - ISAAR(CPF) 2nd edition
Status
Level of detail
Dates of creation, revision and deletion
Prepared for import into AtoM by Westminster School Archive staff, 2019-2020
Language(s)
Script(s)
Sources
Users should note that the information recorded here that is not to be found in the first two volumes of the Record of Old Westminsters and its first Supplement has been assembled from various published and manuscript sources by Hugh Edmund Pagan MA FSA, and all new resulting text is his copyright, © 2014.
The Record of Old Westminsters: A biographical list of all those who are known to have been educated at Westminster School from the earliest times to 1927, Volumes 1 & 2, compiled by G. F. Russell Barker and Alan H. Stenning, London, 1928.