WOOD, WILLIAM; b.; adm. (aged 10) Feb 1738/9 (Hutton's); left 1744.
Hutton's
31 People & Organisations results for Hutton's
WILSON, WILLIAM, brother of Richard Wilson (qv); b. 28 Feb 1734; adm. (aged 14) Jan 1749/50 (Hutton's); left 1750; barrister [check]; Recorder of Newcastle upon Tyne; m. Jan 1770 Mary, eldest dau. of Christopher Scott, Aldborough in Holderness, Yorks, Mayor of Hull; d. 1792 (will proved PCC 26 Jun 1792).
WILSON, RICHARD, second son of Joshua Wilson, Pontefract, Yorks., attorney and Alderman, and Anne, dau. of William Clifton, Houghton, Yorks.; b. 18 May 1732; adm. Feb 1745/6 (Hutton's); left 1750; Trinity Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 30 Jun 1749, scholar 11 May 1750, matr. 1750; adm. Inner Temple 1 Aug 1752; migr. to Gray’s Inn 24 Jan 1753, called to bar 20 May 1757, Bencher 9 Feb 1770; Recorder of Berwick on Tweed; inherited Crofton Hall estate, near Wakefield, Yorks., on death of his father in 1778; d. unm. 17 Sep 1794.
VINCENT, WILLIAM, fifth surviving son of Giles Vincent, Lime Street Ward, London, packer and Portugal merchant, and Sarah, dau. of Francis Holloway, Newnham Murren, Oxfordshire; nephew of Richard Vincent (QS 1708, qv); b. 2 Nov 1739; adm. Sep 1748 (Hutton's); KS 1753; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1757, adm. pens. 9 Jun 1757, scholar 21 Apr 1758, matr. 1758; BA 1761; MA 1764; BD and DD 1776; Usher at the School 1762-71, Under Master 28 May 1771-88, Head Master 1788-1802; ordained deacon (Norwich, lit. dim. from Rochester) 19 Dec 1763, priest (London) 22 Sep 1765; Vicar of Longdon, Worcs., 1778; Rector of All Hallows the Great, London 17 Dec 1778-1803; Chaplain in Ordinary to George III (occurs 1778-93), Sub-Almoner 28 Nov 1783 - Feb 1808; Dean of Westminster from 7 Aug 1802; Prolocutor, Lower House of Convocation 1802, 1806, 1807; Rector of St. John’s, Westminster 28 May 1803 - Jan 1807; Rector of Islip, Oxfordshire, from 31 Jan 1807; one of the soundest scholars of his day, although he resembled Busby in his love for the rod; when Dean of Westminster obtained an annual grant from Parliament for the restoration of Henry VII’s Chapel; his name is perpetuated by Vincent Square, preserved through his influence as playing fields for the School; Busby Trustee 22 Apr 1790; author, Defence of Public Education, 1801, and of a number of highly regarded works on ancient geography and other subjects; m. 15 Aug 1771 Hannah, fourth dau. of George Wyatt, Chief Clerk of Vote Office, House of Commons; d. 21 Dec 1815. Buried St. Benedict’s Chapel, Westminster Abbey (monument facing Poets’ Corner, with inscription composed by himself). DNB.
TURNER, EXUPERIUS, son of William Turner, Derby, attorney, and Dorothy, dau. of William Hodgkinson, Derby; bapt. All Saints, Derby 16 Feb 1724 (IGI); adm. (aged 15) Jun 1740 (Hutton's); left 1742; St. John’s Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 22 Dec 1742, fellow commoner 3 Mar 1742/3, matr. 1743; adm. Inner Temple 7 Apr 1742, called to bar 24 Jun 1748; practising as barrister in West Indies at 1 May 1755; Leyden Univ., adm. 2 Nov 1757; m. 1st, 10 Feb 1749 Ann Allsebrook; m. 2nd, 23 May 1751 (divorced by Act of Parliament 1760) Elizabeth Louisa, dau. of George Minshull, Ipswich, Suffolk.
TIDDEMAN, FRANCIS; b.; adm. (aged 11) 1748/9 (Hutton's); left 1751.
STYLE, ROBERT; b.; adm. (aged 14) Apr 1742 (Hutton's); left 1743.
PRICE, ROBERT; b.; adm. (aged 11) Nov 1735 (Hutton's); left 1738.
POLE, GERMAN, son of German Pole, Conduit Street, London, and his second wife Mary, dau. of Robert Gayer, Stoke Poges, Bucks.; b.; adm. (aged 11) Mar 1739/40 (Hutton's); St. Mary Hall, Oxford, matr. 11 Feb 1747; d. unm. 17 Mar 1765.
MYTTON, DEVEREUX, third son of Richard Mytton, Pontyscrowryd, Montgomeryshire, and Dorothy, dau. of Brockwel Wynn, Garth, Montgomeryshire; b. 22 Oct 1725; at Shrewsbury Sch. 1737; adm. (aged 15) Jul 1742 (Hutton's); left 1745; inherited Pontyscrowryd and Garth estates; m. 1st, 17 Jan 1745 (IGI) Anne, dau. of Richard Jones, Trelydan, Montgomeryshire; m. 2nd, Eleanora, dau. of George Devereux; d. 13 May 1809.