ASHBURNHAM, BERTRAM, 5TH EARL OF ASHBURNHAM, eldest son of Bertram Ashburnham, 4th Earl of Ashburnham (qv); b. 28 Oct 1840; adm. Jun 1854 (James'); left 1857; went to school at Fontainebleau, France; accompanied Marquis of Bath on Garter mission to Vienna Jul 1867; Roman Catholic convert 1872; succ. father as 5th Earl of Ashburnham 22 Jun 1878; a Knight of Malta and Knight Grand Cross of Pontifical Order of Pope Pius; as a peer initially took Conservative whip, but joined Liberal Party over Irish Home Rule; chairman, British Home Rule Association 1886; the representative in Britain of Don Carlos and the legitimate restoration party of Spain; FSA 3 Jun 1880, resigned 1893; declined household office in Liberal government 1893; DL JP Brecknockshire, JP Sussex, Carmarthenshire; m. 25 Feb 1888 Emily, dau. of Richard Chaplin; d. in Paris 15 Jan 1913.
James'
322 People & Organisations results for James'
ASHBURNHAM, HON. JOHN, second son of Bertram Ashburnham, 4th Earl of Ashburnham (qv); b. 6 Mar 1845; adm. 21 Jan 1858 (James'); left 1858; entered Diplomatic Service 1866; attaché at Lisbon 1867, Madrid 1869; Third Secretary 1870; transferred Constantinople 1872; Second Secretary 1875; transferred Vienna 1879; acting Agent and Consul-General, Bulgaria 1879-80; retired 7 Apr 1883; JP Sussex; m. 21 Mar 1907 Maud Mary, eldest dau. of Charles Royal-Dawson, South East Wynaad, Madras Presidency, India; d. 12 Apr 1912.
ASHBURNHAM, HON. WILLIAM, third son of Bertram Ashburnham, 4th Earl of Ashburnham (qv); b. 29 Mar 1847; adm. 21 Jan 1858 (James'); left 1858; Trinity Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 8 Nov 1864, fellow commoner same day, matr. Mich. 1866; BA 1869; adm. Inner Temple 11 Jan 1869, called to bar 26 Jan 1874; d. 27 May 1897.
AUBREY, WILLIAM AUBREY LLOYD PHILLIPS, son of Rev. John Evans, Crickhowell, Breconshire, and Elizabeth, dau. of Thomas Smith Philipps, Milford Haven, Pembs.; b. 28 Aug 1855; adm. 3 Feb 1869 (James'); BB 10 Feb 1869; QS 1870; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1874, matr. 28 May 1874; BA 1878; assumed surname of Aubrey in lieu of Evans 1879; a journalist; on staff Westminster Gazette; living Llanwnda, Pembrokeshire, in 1881 (1881 Census).
BAILEY, EDWARD HORSMAN, eldest son of Edward Bailey, solicitor, Leigham Court Road, Streatham, Surrey, and Maria, younger dau. of James Coles, Old Park, Clapham, Surrey; b. 5 Oct 1849; adm. 23 Jan 1862 (James'); left Christmas 1865; adm. solicitor Hilary 1871; practised in London; Col. commanding 2nd Vol. Battalion, East Surrey Regt., 1893-1906; VD 1892; TD 1920; m. 8 May 1884 Jane, dau. of Alexander Rose, Streatham Common, Surrey; d. 19 Feb 1933.
BAILEY, LEONARD, brother of Edward Horsman Bailey (qv); b. 6 Sep 1853; adm. 5 Oct 1867 (James'); left Christmas 1871; land agent (1881 and 1901 Censuses); d. 17 Feb 1927.
BAILEY, NORMAN COLES, brother of Edward Horsman Bailey (qv); b. 23 Jul 1857; adm. 27 Sep 1866 (James'); left Aug 1874; adm. solicitor Mar 1880; practised in Berners Street, London, firm Baileys, Shaw and Gillett; played Association Football for England v. Scotland 1878-87, v. Wales 1879, 1882-7, and v. Ireland 1884-5; the finest half back of his day; played for the Clapham Rovers and afterwards for the Swifts; one of the founders of the Corinthian Football Club; a Vice-President, Football Association; m. 20 Apr 1887 Sarah Alice, eldest dau. of James Grierson, Holland Villas Road, Kensington, general manager Great Western Railway; d. 13 Jan 1923.
BAILEY, REGINALD, brother of Edward Horsman Bailey (qv); b. 27 Jul 1852; adm. 27 Sep 1866 (James'); left Aug 1870; adm. solicitor Nov 1875; practised in Queen Anne Street, Cavendish Square, London; m. 26 Jan 1892 Grace, second dau. of James Grierson, Holland Villas Road, Kensington, general manager Great Western Railway; d. 3 May 1921.
BARBER, JOHN HARRY BLUMBERG, son of John Barber; b. 15 Jan 1859; adm. 26 Sep 1872 (James'); left Christmas 1874; entered the Army from the militia as 2nd Lieut., 4th Foot, 2 Jul 1879; Lieut., Royal Lancs Regt. 1 Jul 1881; resigned 1 Aug 1888; subsequently a sketch artist, signing his productions “Crowe”.
BARKER, CHARLES MYLNE, third son of Edgar Barker FRCS, Oxford Square, Hyde Park, London, and Anne, second dau. of William Mortlock, Meldreth, Cambs.; b. 11 Mar 1843; adm. 28 May 1856 (James'); QS 13 Apr 1859; first Hon. Sec. of the Elizabethan Club, founded in 1861 mainly for athletic purposes, and originally confined to QSS; left 19 May 1862; adm. solicitor Mich. 1867; practised in Bedford Row, London; President, Incorporated Law Society 1905-6; m. 17 Aug 1861 Adela Louise, eldest dau. of John Jenkins Clarke, Devonshire Place, London, stockbroker; d. 17 Feb 1910.