HASTINGS, HON. FERDINANDO, brother of Francis Hastings, 10th Earl of Huntingdon (qv); b. 23 Jan 1732/3; adm. Oct 1741 (Preston's); d. at Mrs Preston’s boarding house, Dean’s Yard, 21 Apr 1743. Buried North Transept, Westminster Abbey.
Preston's
48 People & Organisations results for Preston's
HESKETH, SIR THOMAS, BART., son of Thomas Hesketh MP, Rufford, Lancs., and Martha, only dau. of James St. Amand, St. Paul’s, Covent Garden, apothecary; b. 21 Jan 1726/7; adm. Jan 1739/40 (Preston's); left 1743; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 29 Oct 1743; created baronet 5 May 1761; travelling in Italy 1769-72; his wife was the first cousin and favourite correspondent of William Cowper (adm. 1742, qv); m. 5 Sep 1751 Harriet, dau. of Ashley Cowper, Clerk of the Parliaments; d. 4 Mar 1778.
HESKIN, WILLIAM; b.; adm. (aged 16) Apr 1744 (Preston's); left 1745.
JOHNSON, SIMON; b.; adm. (aged 15) Oct 1740 (Preston's); left 1741. [note Simon Johnson, St. John the Evangelist, Westminster, will proved PCC 16 Feb 1787]
JUXON, SIR ROBERT, BART., brother of Sir Thomas Hesketh, Bart. (qv); b. 23 Apr 1728; adm. Jan 1739/40 (Preston's); left 1745; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 3 May 1745; a wine merchant at Bristol; succeded his brother as 2nd baronet 4 Mar 1778; assumed surname of Juxon in lieu of Hesketh 2 Jun 1792; m. 19 Apr 1748 Sarah, dau. of William Plumbe, Wavertree, Lancs.; d. 30 Dec 1796.
KING, THOMAS, son of Thomas King, London; b.; adm. (aged 7) Apr 1741 (Preston's); left 1751; Merton Coll. Oxford, matr. 20 Aug 1751; BA 1757. [perhaps Thomas King ordained deacon (Peterborough) 25 Sep 1757].
KNIGHT, WILLIAM; b.; adm. (aged 12) Apr 1744 (Preston's); left 1747.
MARSDEN, JOHN, son of William Marsden, Barnsley and Sheffield, Yorks., Surveyor of Woods North of the Trent, attorney, and Hannah, widow of Timothy Heywood, Sheffield, apothecary, and dau. of --- Crabtree, Houghton Hall, Yorks.; b.; adm. (aged 12) Mar 1742/3 (Preston's); KS 1745; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1749, matr. 26 May 1749, Westminster Student 23 Dec 1749 – void 13 Feb 1762 (expiry year of grace as R. Llandyssil from 17 Feb 1761); BA 1753; MA 1756; BD and DD 1777; ordained priest (Oxford) 23 Feb 1754/5; Chaplain to Hon. Robert Hay-Drummond (qv) when Bishop of St. Asaph in 1760, and subsequently to him as Archbishop of York; Precentor of St. Asaph from 17 Jan 1760; Rector of Llandyssil, Montgomeryshire 1761; Prebendary of Southwell from 27 Mar 1762; Vicar of Feliskirk, Yorks. 1765; Vicar of Birstall, Yorks., 1768 (disp. to hold with Feliskirk); Prebendary of York 7 May 1772 – Mar 1785, res.; Rector of Bolton Percy, Yorks., 1774; Vicar of Felkirk, Yorks., 1777-93; of Burntwood Lodge, Yorks.; m. 1st, Mary, dau. of John Acton, The Beach, Macclesfield, Cheshire; m. 2nd, Mary ---; m. 3rd, Esther, dau. of Henry De la Bere, York; d. 25 Feb 1796. [Presumably ordained deacon (Gloucester) 3 Feb 1754/5, priest (Oxford) 23 Feb 1755/6; Curate, Barnburgh, Yorks., in 1763-4].
MAY, ARTHUR, second son of Thomas May, Lisbon, wine merchant, and Margaret, dau. of Arthur Stert MP, Membland, Devon; b. 4 Apr 1727; adm. (aged 11) Apr 1738 (Preston's); d. 12 Apr 1739.
MAY, JOSEPH, brother of Arthur May (qv); b. 16 Feb 1729/30; adm. (aged 8) Apr 1738 (Preston's); left 1745; a wine merchant at Lisbon; returned to England 1775; of Hale House, Hampshire; m. 18 Jul 1764 Mary, dau. of John Coppendale, Lisbon, wine merchant; d. 31 Oct 1796.