PAGET, HENRY WILLIAM, 1ST MARQUIS OF ANGLESEY, eldest son of Henry Paget (formerly Bayly), 1st Earl of Uxbridge, and Jane, only dau. of Very Rev. Arthur Champagné, Dean of Clonmacnoise; b. 17 May 1768; adm. 8 Sep 1777; left 1784; Christ Church, Oxford, matr. 14 Oct 1784; MA 1786; Capt., Staffordshire Militia 12 Dec 1790; raised a company of infantry from his father’s tenantry which became known as the 80th Foot, of which he became Lieut. -Col., (temp. rank) 12 Sep 1793; served with it under Duke of York in Flanders 1794; Lieut., 7th Foot 11 Mar 1795; Capt., 23rd Foot 25 Mar 1795; Maj., 65th Foot 29 May 1795; Lieut. -Col. commandant, 80th Foot 30 May 1795; 16th Light Dragoons 16 Jun 1795; Brevet Col., 3 May 1796; Lieut. -Col., 7th Light Dragoons 6 Apr 1797; commanded cavalry brigade in Duke of York’s expedition to Netherlands 1799; Col., 7th Light Dragoons 16 May 1801 – Dec 1842; Major-Gen., 29 Apr 1802; Lieut. -Gen., 25 Apr 1808; in command of cavalry which covered Sir John Moore’s retreat to Corunna 1808; commanded an infantry division in Walcheren expedition 1809; commanded allied cavalry and horse artillery at battle of Waterloo, where he lost a leg; Gen., 12 Aug 1819; Col., Royal Horse Guards, from 20 Dec 1842; Field Marshal 9 Nov 1846; MP Caernarvon 1790-6, Milborne Port 1796 – Jun 1804, 1806 – Jan 1810; succ. father as 2nd Earl of Uxbridge 13 Mar 1812; created Marquis of Anglesey 4 Jul 1815; supported Tory governments to 1829; Master-Gen. of the Ordnance (with a seat in the Cabinet) 30 Apr 1827 – 29 Jan 1828; Privy Councillor 30 Apr 1827; Lord Lieut., Ireland 27 Feb 1828 – dismissal Jan 1829, for adopting conciliatory attitude to Roman Catholic claims; LLD Trinity Coll. Dublin 6 Mar 1828; reappointed Lord Lieut. Ireland by incoming Whig government 23 Dec 1830, holding post to resignation on health grounds Sep 1833; took Whig whip in House of Lords 1830 onwards; Master-Gen. of the Ordnance (without seat in Cabinet) 8 Jul 1846 – 27 Feb 1852; Lord Lieut., Anglesey, from 28 Apr 1812, and Lord Lieut., Staffordshire, from 3 Feb 1849; GCB 2 Jan 1815; GCH 1816; KG 19 Feb 1818; Busby Trustee 27 May 1820; m. 1st, 25 Jul 1795 Lady Caroline Elizabeth Villiers, third dau. of George Villiers, 4th Earl of Jersey; m. 2nd, 1810 Lady Charlotte Cadogan, divorced wife of Hon. Henry Wellesley (afterwards 1st Earl Cowley), and sister of Hon. William Bromley Cadogan (qv); d. 29 Apr 1854. DNB.
Taxonomy
Code
Scope note(s)
Source note(s)
- https://collections.westminster.org.uk/index.php/school