WINGFIELD, JOHN, brother of William Wingfield (qv); b.; adm. 5 Feb 1770; KS (aged 13) 1773; Capt. of the School 1777; elected head to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1778, adm. pens. 17 Jun 1778, scholar 23 Apr 1779, matr. 1780; BA 1782; MA 1785; BD 1794; DD 1799; Minor Fellow, Trinity Coll. 2 Oct 1783, Major Fellow 6 Jul 1785; an Usher at the School 1781-8, Under Master 1788-1802, Head Master 13 Sep – Dec 1802; ordained; Prebendary of Worcester from 27 Jan 1803; Perpetual Curate of Putney, Surrey Jan – Dec 1804; Vicar of Kempsey, Worcs., 27 Nov 1804-15; Rector of Easton, Hampshire 29 Nov 1804; Prebendary of York from 27 Sep 1812; Rector of Whitbourne, Herefs., from 14 Sep 1815; Vicar of Bromsgrove, Worcs., from 27 Oct 1815; m. 8 Sep 1803 Mary, eldest dau. of Rev. Thomas James DD, Head Master, Rugby Sch.; d. 9 Dec 1825.
WILSON, JOHN, of Middlesex; b.; adm.; QS; elected to Christ Church, Oxford 1602, matr. 5 Nov 1602, aged 16, Westminster Student to 1612; BA 1606; MA 1609; DD 1619; adm. Gray’s Inn 2 Feb 1612/3; a joint patent of the Head Mastership of the School was granted to Richard Ireland (qv) and himself 25 Jan 1609/10; on Ireland’s escape to France a few months later he became Head Master; a joint patent of the Head Mastership was granted to him and to Lambert Osbaldeston (qv) 7 Dec 1621, Osbaldeston succeeding him as Head Master in 1622; ordained; Rector of Bedale, Yorks., from 8 Aug 1621; Vicar of Burneston, Yorks., 1 Jul 1622-34; Rector of St. Mary, Castlegate, York 1625; Prebendary of Westminster Oct 1623 – res 1635, of Ripon 14 Aug 1623 and of Lincoln from 3 Mar 1629/30; Dean of Ripon from 1624; Master of the Savoy; lic. to m. 22 Apr 1616 Johanna, dau. of William Stanlake, King Street, Westminster, grocer; d. 19 Feb 1634/5.
WILLIAMSON, RICHARD, second son of Edmond Williamson (adm. 1773, qv); b. 25 Nov 1802; adm. 7 Jun 1814; left 1819; Trinity Coll. Cambridge, adm. pens. 16 Jun 1820, scholar 1823; 9th Wrangler and 5th Classic 1825; Second Chancellor’s Classical medal 1825; 1st Members Prize (Bachelors) 1827; BA 1825; MA 1828; DD 1835; Fellow, Trinity Coll. 1827; ordained deacon 1828, priest 1829 (both Ely); Head Master of the School 22 Sep 1828 – Aug 1846; Rector of Sutton Coldfield, Warwicks., 1844-50; Vicar of Pershore, Worcs., from 1850; Hon. Canon, Worcester 1851; m. 4 Jan 1833 Anne, sister of John Edward Gray (qv); d. 11 Sep 1865.
Head Master of Westminster School, 1561.
VINCENT, WILLIAM, fifth surviving son of Giles Vincent, Lime Street Ward, London, packer and Portugal merchant, and Sarah, dau. of Francis Holloway, Newnham Murren, Oxfordshire; nephew of Richard Vincent (QS 1708, qv); b. 2 Nov 1739; adm. Sep 1748 (Hutton's); KS 1753; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1757, adm. pens. 9 Jun 1757, scholar 21 Apr 1758, matr. 1758; BA 1761; MA 1764; BD and DD 1776; Usher at the School 1762-71, Under Master 28 May 1771-88, Head Master 1788-1802; ordained deacon (Norwich, lit. dim. from Rochester) 19 Dec 1763, priest (London) 22 Sep 1765; Vicar of Longdon, Worcs., 1778; Rector of All Hallows the Great, London 17 Dec 1778-1803; Chaplain in Ordinary to George III (occurs 1778-93), Sub-Almoner 28 Nov 1783 - Feb 1808; Dean of Westminster from 7 Aug 1802; Prolocutor, Lower House of Convocation 1802, 1806, 1807; Rector of St. John’s, Westminster 28 May 1803 - Jan 1807; Rector of Islip, Oxfordshire, from 31 Jan 1807; one of the soundest scholars of his day, although he resembled Busby in his love for the rod; when Dean of Westminster obtained an annual grant from Parliament for the restoration of Henry VII’s Chapel; his name is perpetuated by Vincent Square, preserved through his influence as playing fields for the School; Busby Trustee 22 Apr 1790; author, Defence of Public Education, 1801, and of a number of highly regarded works on ancient geography and other subjects; m. 15 Aug 1771 Hannah, fourth dau. of George Wyatt, Chief Clerk of Vote Office, House of Commons; d. 21 Dec 1815. Buried St. Benedict’s Chapel, Westminster Abbey (monument facing Poets’ Corner, with inscription composed by himself). DNB.
Of Hampshire ; b. c.1504 (aged 12 at Christmas 1516, when described as of parish St.Cross, Southampton) ; ed.Winchester Coll., scholar 1517, and Corpus Christi Coll.Oxford, scholar 18 Jun 1520 ; BA 1524 ; MA 1534 ; Probationer Fellow, Corpus Christi Coll. 30 May 1524 (still lecturer there 1526-8) ; by 1533 probably usher at school attached to St.Anthony’s Hospital, London ; Head Master, Eton Coll. Midsummer 1534 – Mar 1540/1, when he was committed to the Marshalsea Prison and dismissed for misconduct with a pupil ; when at Eton acquired the reputation of being “the greatest beater of his time” ; ordained ; Vicar of Braintree, Essex 27 Sep 1537- Dec 1544 ; Canon of Windsor 14 Dec 1551 – Jun 1554 ; Rector of Calborne, Isle of Wight 26 Mar 1553-4 ; Head Master, Westminster School, from Dec 1555 ; author, Ralph Roister Doister, 1566 (the first English comedy), and other works ; buried unm. St.Margaret, Westminster 23 Dec 1556 (as Nicholas Yevedale). ODNB.
Son of Arthur Michael Marshall Spurr and Patricia Ann Newall; b. 9 Oct. 1953; ed. The King’s Sch., Canterbury, Sydney Grammar Sch., Univ. of Sydney, BA 1975; Corpus Christi Coll. Oxf.; DPhil 1984; head of classics and house master Eton 1984-2000; Head Master Clifton Coll. 2000-5; succeeded as Head Master of the School Aug. 2005; group education dir. Inspired 2014-; m. 1982 Susanna Armani.
SMITH, SAMUEL, son of Samuel Smith, Compton Street, London, merchant, and Christian, dau. of Rev. Edward Pain, Winchester; b. 17 Jul 1731; adm. (aged 12) Jul 1744; KS 1746; elected to Trinity Coll. Cambridge 1750, adm. pens. 14 Jun 1750, scholar 26 Apr 1751, matr. 1751; BA 1754; MA 1757; LLD 1764; Minor Fellow, Trinity Coll. 2 Oct 1756, Major Fellow 6 Jul 1757; ordained deacon 21 Sep 1755, priest 21 Dec 1755 (both Ely); Head Master of the School Jun 1764 -–88; Rector of Walpole St. Andrew, Norfolk, from 1762; Rector of Dry Drayton, Cambs., from 1785; Prebendary of Westminster from 29 Mar 1787, and of Peterborough from 28 Sep 1787; Busby Trustee 10 Apr 1766; m. 1st, 27 Aug 1764 Ann, dau. of John Jackson, King Street, Westminster; m. 2nd, 9 May 1791 Susanna, sister of Thomas Pettingal (qv); m. 3rd, 19 Jun 1794 Ann Pinckney, Cathedral Precinct, Peterborough, Northants; d. 23 Mar 1808. Buried North Aisle, Westminster Abbey.
Son of James Smyth Scott QC (I), Dublin, Ireland, barrister, and Louisa, dau. of Hon. and Most Rev.Charles Brodrick DD, Archbishop of Cashel ; b. 18 Jan 1825 ; ed. Eton and Trinity Coll.Cambridge, adm.pens. 30 Sep 1842, matr.Mich.1844, scholar 1846 ; Pitt University Scholar 1847 ; Senior Classic, Senior Chancellor’s Medallist and 22nd Wrangler 1848 ; BA 1848 ; Le Bas Prize 1849 ; Member’s Prize 1850 ; MA 1851 ; BD 1860 ; DD 1867 ; Fellow, Trinity Coll. 1849-55 ; adm. Inner Temple 18 Nov 1848 ; ordained deacon 1854 (Ely), priest 1856 (Worcester) ; Head Master, Westminster School Sep 1855 – Aug 1883 ; Prebendary of St.Paul’s from 12 Feb 1873 ; Hon.Student, Christ Church, Oxford 1875 ; author, A letter to the Rt.Hon.Sir David Dundas on the position and prospects of Westminster School, 1861 (pamphlet) ; m. 19 Dec 1855 Susan Georgiana, youngest dau. of Edward Smyth, Norwich, banker (“a cold, austere, very cultivated woman”, Ethel Smyth, As Time went on, 110) ; d. 7 Dec 1894.
Second son of the Rev. Robert Rutherford, Minister of the United Presbyterian Church at Mountain Cross, Peeblesshire, by Agnes, daughter of William Gunion, a Glasgow merchant; born July 17, 1853; educated at Glasgow High School, St. Andrew's Univ., and Ball. Coll. Oxon., where he graduated B.A. 1877, M.A. 1880; 1st class Classics (Mods.) 1874; 2nd class Nat. Sci. 1876; a Classical master at St. Paul's School 1876-83; elected Fellow and Praelector of Univ. Coll. Oxon. June 1883; appointed by the Governing Body as Scott's successor June 1883; ordained Sept. 23, 1883; installed Head Master up School Sept 17, 1883; resigned on account of ill health July 1901; a Greek scholar of European reputation; LL.D. (St. Andrew's) 1885; author of 'The New Phrynichus' (1881), an edition of the 'Fables of Babricus' (1883), and other works; married Jan. 3, 1884, Constance Gordon, daughter of John Thomson Renton, of Bradston Brooke, Surrey; died July 19, 1907. ODNB.